Optimal Markets Inc v. FTI Consulting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Optimal Markets Inc
Defendant: FTI Consulting, Inc., Auction Technologies LLC, Auction Technologies Inc., David Salant, Harold Lea and Paul Milgrom
Case Number: 3:2008cv05765
Filed: December 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Copyright Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 17:501 Copyright Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Stipulation Extending Time to Respoond to Conterclaims. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/23/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaims and continuing the Case Management Conference from 4/17/09 to 5/1/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/10/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/5/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optimal Markets Inc v. FTI Consulting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optimal Markets Inc
Represented By: James Patrick Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTI Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auction Technologies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auction Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Salant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Lea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Milgrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?