Viacom International Inc. et al v. YouTube, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Viacom International, Inc., et al. sought to compel production of documents by non-party Respondents Artis Capital Management L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC and TriplePoint Capital LLC.

Plaintiff: Viacom International Inc., Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP, The Music Force LLC and Sindrome Records Ltd.
Defendant: YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC and Google, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008mc80129
Filed: June 20, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING "MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION & CLARIFICATION; MOTION TO INTERVENE" (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
December 9, 2008 Filing 38 Letter from Pavel Lazarenko and Jonathan Lee Riches. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
September 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/22/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 35 STIPULATION [Proposed] Order and Stipulation for an Extension of Time to Produce Documents by Artis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TriplePoint Capital LLC. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 17, 2008 Filing 36 Letter from Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow re two pending DOJ investigations into the validty of Viacom's Public Performance. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
August 18, 2008 Filing 34 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/15/2008 before Illston (Date Filed: 8/18/2008). (Court Reporter McVickar.) (ts, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2008)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER COMPELLING DOCUMENT PRODUCTION FROM NONPARTIES ARTIS, TRIPLEPOINT AND SEQUOIA (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Illston granting 30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 11, 2008 Filing 30 MOTION for attorney Eric T. Kanefsky leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611022284.) filed by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 28 Declaration of Scott B. Wilkens in Support of 27 Reply Memorandum, Reply Declaration of Scott B. Wilkens in Support of Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoenas to Artis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, and Triplepoint Capital LLC filed byViacom International Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 27 ) (Hibbard, Stephen) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 27 Reply Memorandum Reply Brief In Support of Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoenas to Artis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, and Triplepoint Capital LLC filed byViacom International Inc.. (Hibbard, Stephen) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
July 25, 2008 Filing 29 MOTION for attorney Susan J. Kohlmann leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021692.) filed by Viacom International Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 26 Declaration of Melinda Dunn in Support of 21 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byArtis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TriplePoint Capital LLC. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 25 Declaration of David Lamond in Support of 21 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byArtis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TriplePoint Capital LLC. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 24 Declaration of Robert Riemer in Support of 21 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byArtis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TriplePoint Capital LLC. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 23 Declaration of Kevin W. Thorne in Support of 21 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byArtis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TriplePoint Capital LLC. (Related document(s) 21 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 22 Declaration in Support of 21 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Michael H. Rubin in Support of Respondents' Opposition filed byArtis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TriplePoint Capital LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re 1 MOTION to Compel Respondents' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoenas to Artis Capital Management L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC and TriplePoint Capital LLC filed byArtis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TriplePoint Capital LLC. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER adjusting briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Illston on 7/17/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 15, 2008 Filing 19 STIPULATION re 1 MOTION to Compel [Proposed] Order and Stipulation for Extended Briefing Schedule by Artis Capital Management, L.P., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TriplePoint Capital LLC. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
July 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting re 17 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020735.) Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/1/08. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2008)
June 30, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION of David R. Hassel for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020735) filed by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER continuing motion to 8/15/08. Signed by Judge Illston on 6/30/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2008)
June 27, 2008 Filing 15 STIPULATION re 1 MOTION to Compel [Proposed] Order and Stipulation for Continuance of Hearing Date by YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Kramer, David) (Filed on 6/27/2008)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 3 Motion to Compel (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Filing 10 (UNDER SEAL DOCUMENT) Declaration of Scott B. Wilkens in Support of 9 MOTION to Compel filed byThe Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (Related document(s) 9 ) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 24, 2008 Filing 9 (UNDER SEAL DOCUMENT) JOINT MOTION to Compel filed by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP re 1 MOTION to Compel, 3 MOTION to Compel, 2 Declaration in Support,,, 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.), Received Order,, Received Document,,, 4 Declaration in Support,,, 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.), Received Document,,, 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.), Received Order,, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney William M. Hohengarten leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.) filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, Comedy Partners. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Scott B. Wilkens leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.) filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, Comedy Partners. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Donald B. Verrilli, Jr. leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611020418.) filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, Comedy Partners. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 4 Declaration of Scott B. Wilkens in Support of 3 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Compel filed byThe Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (Related document(s) 3 ) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Joint Motion to Compel filed by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 2 Declaration of Scott B. Wilkens in Support of 1 MOTION to Compel filed byThe Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (Related document(s) 1 ) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Filing 1 JOINT MOTION to Compel ( case 07cv2103 LLS and 07cv3532 LLS USDC New York) filed by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Received Document: Under Seal Joint Notice of Motion to Compel by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Received Proposed Order 1 by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Received Proposed Order 3 by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)
June 20, 2008 Received Document : Under Seal Declaration of Scott B. Wilkens by The Music Force LLC, Sindrome Records Ltd., Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International Inc., Black Entertainment Television, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co., Murbo Music Publishing, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc., Cal IV Entertainment LLC, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers Association, Comedy Partners, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Stage Three Music (US) Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLP. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Viacom International Inc. et al v. YouTube, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viacom International Inc.
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comedy Partners
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Music Television, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Entertainment Television
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Football Association Premier League Limited
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bourne Co.
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murbo Music Publishing
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherry Lane Music Publishing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cal IV Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tur
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Music Publishers Association
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stage Three Music (US) Inc.
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Marks Music Company
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Bienstock Music Company
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alley Music Corporation
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X-Ray Dog Music, Inc.
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federation Francaise De Tennis
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scottish Premier League Limited
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Music Force Media Group LLP
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Music Force LLC
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sindrome Records Ltd.
Represented By: Blair Allen Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, Inc.
Represented By: Bart Edward Volkmer, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Represented By: Bart Edward Volkmer, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Bart Edward Volkmer, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?