DiLeonardo et al v. Fletcher et al

Plaintiff: Frank L. DiLeonardo, Jr. and Timothy Tatum
Defendant: Joseph Fletcher
Case Number: 3:2008mc80144
Filed: July 14, 2008
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT OF EXECUTION issued in the amount of $167,119, San Francisco County (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
January 14, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Judgment Debtor Exam re 17 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/14/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 13, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued as to Joseph Fletcher in the amount of $171,619.00 (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
December 9, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER For Appearance and Examination re 15 . Judgment Debtor Exam set for 1/19/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/9/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
April 14, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT of Execution issued as to Joseph Fletcher in the amount of $205,134. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
January 9, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING Defendant Joseph Fletcher's Appearance and Examination to 3/3/2009 10:00 AM re 10 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/9/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
November 4, 2008 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR CONDITIONAL FOREBEARANCE OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT and to Continue Hearing re defendant Joseph Fletcher's Appearance and Examination re 7 . Judgment Debtor Exam set for 1/6/2009 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/4/08. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DiLeonardo et al v. Fletcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank L. DiLeonardo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?