Zircon Corporation v. The Stanley Works
Plaintiff: Zircon Corporation
Defendant: The Stanley Works
Case Number: 3:2009cv00042
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Laporte on 5/24/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION & ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/24/2010 Continuing Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement re 44 Stipulation. Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010) Modified on 2/25/2010 (tn, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 34 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Protective Order for the Protection of Confidential Information filed by The Stanley Works. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/15/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION & ORDER to File Amended Answer re 31 Stipulation Signed by Mag. Judge Laporte on 12/11/2009. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING Case Management Conference for 12/15/2009 10:00 AM. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due 12/8/2009. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/23/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte filed by Zircon Corporation. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/12/2009. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENTER CASE SCHEDULE re 23 Stipulation filed by Zircon Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/2/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE DEFENDANT'S TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND TO RESCHEDULE THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 11 Stipulation filed by The Stanley Works. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/19/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/13/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zircon Corporation v. The Stanley Works
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Stanley Works
Represented By: Bryan P. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zircon Corporation
Represented By: Inchan Andrew Kwon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?