Wilson v. Tilton
Petitioner: Clinton Brian Wilson
Respondent: James E. Tilton
Case Number: 3:2009cv00143
Filed: January 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 28, 2011. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: The instant action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice, due to petitioners failure to comply with the Courts order. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT STAY; DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY REOPEN ACTION; DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AMENDED PETITION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 22, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STRIKING UNEXHAUSTED CLAIM; GRANTING 15 REQUEST TO STAY PETITION; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE AMENDED PETITION OR REQUEST FOR STAY; GRANTING 2 , 5 , 7 , 8 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; DENYING 3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clinton Brian Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James E. Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?