Gallup v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Roger Gallup
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 3:2009cv00210
Filed: January 16, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Approving Compromise Settlement. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/3/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Signed by Judge Laporte on 2/5/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending ADR Deadline from 3/16/10 to 3/19/10. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/26/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating Motion to Dismiss, continuing the case management conference to 8/6/10 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/23/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallup v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Gallup
Represented By: Scott L. Woodall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?