The Board of Trustees et al v. Buildex, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees, Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California and Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: Buildex, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00271
Filed: January 22, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER for Total Judgment by Default. Defendants are ordered to pay Plaintiffs' Attorneys' fees of $4825.00 and costs of $642.21. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/13/2011. ***Civil Case Terminated.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting in part motion for default judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/19/10. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER resetting CMC from 11/17/09 to 2/17/10 36 Ex Parte Application ExParte Application to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order Ex Parte Application ExParte Application to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order Ex Parte Application ExParte Application to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees, Laborers Vacation Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/12/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Re 14 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees et al v. Buildex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buildex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?