Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. San Francisco Chrysler Jeep
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Defendant: San Francisco Chrysler Jeep
Case Number: 3:2009cv00441
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Proposed Order filed by Northwest Administrators, Inc. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 12/8/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/29/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PLAINTIFF NORTHWEST ADMINISTRATORS, INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO APPEAR FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING 12 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION. Motion is denied without prejudice to plaintiff's refiling such application after plaintiff has filed an application for an order requiring the judgment debtor to appear for a post-judgment examination. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued to August 7, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 8, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Administrators, Inc. v. San Francisco Chrysler Jeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Administrators, Inc.
Represented By: Robert P. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Chrysler Jeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?