Jackson v. S.A.W. Entertainment Limited et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Jackson
Defendant: S.A.W. Entertainment Limited, Larry Flynt's Hustler Club and Deja Vu
Case Number: 3:2009cv00448
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL re 39 Stipulation filed by S.A.W. Entertainment Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/17/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 Stipulation filed by S.A.W. Entertainment Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/29/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
May 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 8 Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 5 Stipulation filed by S.A.W. Entertainment Limited. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/20/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. S.A.W. Entertainment Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Jackson
Represented By: Kevin J. McInerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.A.W. Entertainment Limited
Represented By: Douglas James Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Flynt's Hustler Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deja Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?