Southall v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Angela Southall
Defendant: United States Postal Service and John Carriaga
Case Number: 3:2009cv00563
Filed: February 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Motor Vehicle Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/08/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/1/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting re 26 Stipulation To Enlarge Mediation Deadline to 8-25-09 filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/16/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE OF INITIAL CASE MANAGMEENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference prev. set for 6/12/9 at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 7/31/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/29/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE USA AS PARTY DEFENDANT for the US Postal Service and John Carriaga. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/16/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southall v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Southall
Represented By: Terry D. Buller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?