Kline v. United Parcel Service Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Kline
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00742
Filed: February 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER re: satisfaction of taxation of costs (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES re 97 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting substitution (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER extending mediation deadline re 27 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER extending mediation deadline (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER continuing cmc to 7/10/09 @ 2:30 p.m. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kline v. United Parcel Service Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kline
Represented By: Mark Christopher Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service Inc.
Represented By: Rishi N. Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?