Mitchell et al v. City of Pittsburg et al
Plaintiff: Paulette Mitchell and Timothy Mitchell, Sr.
Defendant: City of Pittsburg, Aaron Baker and Lester Galer
Case Number: 3:2009cv00794
Filed: February 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/11/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING APPEAL AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/4/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REINSTATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
November 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER SETTING HEARING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/30/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER CHANGING BRIEFING SCHEDULE 244 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO QUASH 232 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENT AND DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER GRANTING DEFT. REQUEST FOR EXTENSTION TO FILE BRIEF. Signed on 7/16/12 by Judge Illston (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER grating extension to file opposition filed by pltf.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/9/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER RE: EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEPOSITION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER Re: Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/16/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER RE: INTERVIEW WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2011 03:00 PM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE: LIMITED REMAND (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 JUDGMENT (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER for partial dismissal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER RE: SCHEDULING (AS AMENDED)MOTION TO DISMISS REMAINS ON 10/26/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS(SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER (with notation by the Court that the 5/7/10 case management remains on calendar) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 correct ORDER (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT re 25 . Amended Complaint is due 11/11/09. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE NON APPEARANCE AT ENE OF CHIEF OF POLICE AARON BAKERSigned by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 8/28/2009. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell et al v. City of Pittsburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pittsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Galer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulette Mitchell
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Mitchell, Sr.
Represented By: Steven Robert Yourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?