Danville Materials, Inc. v. Triodent Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Danville Materials, Inc.
Defendant: Triodent Corporation, Triodent USA, LLC, Triodent Fulfillment LLB, Triodent Tradeshows, LLC and Simon McDonald
Case Number: 3:2009cv00850
Filed: February 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 41 Letter filed by Danville Materials, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2010. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/6/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 38 Stipulation filed by Triodent Corporation. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/5/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 34 Stipulation filed by Danville Materials, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/7/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 Stipulation filed by Danville Materials, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/19/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/9/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danville Materials, Inc. v. Triodent Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danville Materials, Inc.
Represented By: William T. Nagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triodent Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triodent USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triodent Fulfillment LLB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triodent Tradeshows, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?