City of Auburn v. Fuld et al
Plaintiff: City of Auburn
Defendant: Richard S. Fuld, Jr., Christopher M. O'Meara, Joseph M. Gregory, Erin Callan, Ian Lowitt, David Goldfarb, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Marsha Johnson Evans, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman and Ernst & Young LLP
Case Number: 3:2009cv00875
Filed: February 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Securities/Commodities Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:77 Securities Fraud

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Conditional ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE (CTO-3) to the USDC Southern District of New York signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
March 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE re 8 . This case shall be stayed pending issuance of a transfer order by the MDL Panel. Plaintiff's time within which to file a motion to remand shall be extended until such time as ordered by Judge Kaplan in the So Dist of New York following transfer of this action. Defendants' time within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended 30 days from the issuance of an order deciding remand or transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/10/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/5/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Auburn v. Fuld et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Auburn
Represented By: Gerald S. Ohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Fuld, Jr.
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M. O'Meara
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Gregory
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Callan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Lowitt
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Goldfarb
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Akers
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger S. Berlind
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Johnson Evans
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland A. Hernandez
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Kaufman
Represented By: George Michael Newcombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernst & Young LLP
Represented By: James K. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?