White v. Shen et al
Plaintiff: Steve White
Defendant: Ming R. Shen and Xiao F. Zhou
Case Number: 3:2009cv00989
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: American with Disabilities - Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/24/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge 1/25/2011 granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion for Reconsideration (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Attorney Fees (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
March 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 12 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/29/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Shen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve White
Represented By: Paul Leslie Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming R. Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiao F. Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?