ING Bank, fsb v. Ahn et al
Plaintiff: ING Bank, fsb
Defendant: Chang Seob Ahn and Sook Hee Ahn
Case Number: 3:2009cv00995
Filed: March 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Real Property: Other Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/26/2011. ***Civil Case Terminated.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/24/2011 03:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 1/21/2011. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/18/11. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER on 91 95 127 motions for summary judgment and 133 motion to strike by Judge Thelton E. Henderson (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER re: Special Master's fees. An order to show cause will issue if fees are not paid or resolved by 11/26/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/19/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER re pending motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/04/10. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Defendant Bona Financial Group, Inc. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/01/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation and Agreement for Court's Approval to Transport Equipment. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/18/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2010)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER appointing Special Master for discovery (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Finalizing 74 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting re 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Case Management Conference and motion hearing to 5/17/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/05/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the motion hearing date and Case Management Conference to 4/26/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/04/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference and Motion Hearing to 3/29/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/02/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR AT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Thursday, 10/15/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by Monday, 10/5/2009. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 9/16/09. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time to respond to discovery requests. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/20/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER selecting ADR process. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/05/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009) Modified on 8/6/2009 (rbe, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 18 Motion to Dismiss. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009) Modified on 7/14/2009 (tehlc4, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ING Bank, fsb v. Ahn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ING Bank, fsb
Represented By: Gary Wanki Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chang Seob Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sook Hee Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?