Jackson et al v. City Of Pittsburg et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Jackson, A.N.J., B.F.A.J. and Shawna Yvette Martin
Defendant: City Of Pittsburg, Aaron L. Baker, G. Lombardi, C. Smith, P. Dumpa and William Blake Hatcher
Case Number: 3:2009cv01016
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COSTS AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ON APPEAL [re 343 Brief filed by Frederick Jackson, 341 Brief, filed by Frederick Jackson]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/21/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
May 6, 2013 342 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ON APPEAL re 340 Letter filed by Frederick Jackson, 339 USCA Order, (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
April 17, 2013 338 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOLLOWING REMAND (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
April 14, 2011 307 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' CHALLENGES TO THE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 14, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
March 17, 2011 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 17, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
January 20, 2011 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S RESPONSE TO ORDER REGARDING STATE COURT FILING. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 20, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
January 7, 2011 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STATE COURT FILING. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 7, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 3, 2011 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 3, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
December 7, 2010 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES LETTER OF DEFENSE COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 7, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
December 2, 2010 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS OF PLAINTIFF FREDERICK JACKSON IN SUPPORT OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 2, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 10, 2010 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE TO SUBMIT ATTORNEY'S FEES DOCUMENTATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 5, 2010 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF FREDERICK JACKSONS MOTION AND DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEYS FEES by Judge Alsup terminating 257 Motion for Attorney Fees (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
October 26, 2010 266 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup denying 265 Motion to Alter Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 6, 2010 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 6, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 1, 2010 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING COSTS TO ALL PARTIES. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 28, 2010 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DISPUTE OVER BILL OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 28, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 14, 2010 246 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TESTIMONY OF ROGER CLARK by Judge Alsup denying 242 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
August 23, 2010 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL THE TESTIMONY OF ROGER CLARK by Judge Alsup denying 211 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 10, 2010 220 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 9, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 3, 2010 215 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge Alsup granting 212 Motion ; granting 213 Motion (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 23, 2010 199 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 21, 2010 195 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM FOLLOWING JULY 21 CHARGING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 21, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 12, 2010 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish daily refreshments for the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/12/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING CONTINUANCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 9, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting 110 Motion to Amend/Correct ; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 6, 2010 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/6/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 21, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO RULE 11 MOTION re 122 Stipulation, filed by P. Dumpa, Aaron L. Baker, William Blake Hatcher, G. Lombardi, Sara Spires, City Of Pittsburg, C. Smith. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/21/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 14, 2010 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 8, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
May 6, 2010 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 82 Letter filed by P. Dumpa, Aaron L. Baker, William Blake Hatcher, G. Lombardi, Sara Spires, City Of Pittsburg, C. Smith ]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/6/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
March 11, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND by Judge William Alsup [granting 43 Motion to Amend/Correct; plaintiffs is required to E-FILE the amended document]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 1, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 1, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 26, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE STIPULATED PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 26, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 13, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 33 Letter filed by Frederick Jackson]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/13/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
September 25, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NON APPEARANCE AT ENE OF PITTSBURG'S CHIEF OF POLICE. Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/25/2009. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
August 21, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR COMPLETION OF EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/21/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
June 12, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: (1) GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' NEGLIGENCE PER SE CLAIM FOR PERJURY; AND (2) DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' REMAINING NEGLIGENCE PER SE CLAIMS AND CONSPIRACY CLAIM by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. City Of Pittsburg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Jackson
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.N.J.
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B.F.A.J.
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna Yvette Martin
Represented By: Panos Lagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Pittsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Dumpa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Blake Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?