Browman Family Vineyards, Inc. v. Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa
Plaintiff: Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.
Defendant: Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa
Case Number: 3:2009cv01070
Filed: March 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Trademark Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2010 Cases associated: Create association to 3:09-cv-02470-JSW. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING (81 in 3:09-cv-01070-JSW) For Administrative Relief Re Order Regarding Consolidation Of Cases Dated 3/5/10 And Conflicting "Amended Order Referring Case For Settlement Conference" Dated 6/9/10. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whitr on 7/19/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 81 Proposed Order re 79 MOTION For Administrative Relief Re Order Regarding Consolidation Of Cases Dated 3/5/10 And Conflicting "Amended Order Referring Case For Settlement Conference" Dated 6/9/10 by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (White, Robert) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 80 Declaration of Edmund J. Ferdinand III in Support of 79 MOTION For Administrative Relief Re Order Regarding Consolidation Of Cases Dated 3/5/10 And Conflicting "Amended Order Referring Case For Settlement Conference" Dated 6/9/10 filed byCavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 79 ) (White, Robert) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 79 MOTION For Administrative Relief Re Order Regarding Consolidation Of Cases Dated 3/5/10 And Conflicting "Amended Order Referring Case For Settlement Conference" Dated 6/9/10 filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (White, Robert) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 78 Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Settlement Conference set for 9/16/2010 10:00 AM at U.S. District Court, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/6/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 10/12/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/9/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 ***Dispositve Motions Deadline terminated - no dispositive motions filed. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 7, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Jury Trial set for 10/18/2010 08:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2010 02:00 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING 75 Stipulation TO DISMISS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND VOLUNTARY ABANDON TRADEMARK REGISTRATIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/7/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 75 STIPULATION TO DISMISS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND VOLUNTARY ABANDON TRADEMARK REGISTRATIONS; [PROPOSED] ORDER by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
April 21, 2010 *** Previous Case Management Statement Deadline terminated. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 21, 2010 Filing 74 CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing for related case #C09-2470 JSW (Docket #52) set for 6/16/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting (42 in 3:09-cv-02470-JSW) Stipulation of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 5, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 72 STIPULATION & [Proposed] Order Regarding Consolidation of Cases by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (White, Robert) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
December 14, 2009 Filing 71 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session dated 12/2/2009 by Mediator, Richard J. Collier; Mediation session held 12/2/2009; Case did not settle; Mediation process is complete. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 3, 2009 Filing 69 STIPULATION for Protective Order by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING 65 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/30/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Edmund J. Ferdinand III (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 MOTION to Compel filed by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc., 59 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. 11/24/09 hearing vacated. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/6/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Filing 65 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Application for Order Substituting Counsel & [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (White, Robert) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 64 STIPULATION re 55 MOTION to Compel Stipulation & [Proposed] Order Regarding Resolution Of Discovery Dispute & Cancellation Of Hearing by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (White, Robert) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 63 Proposed Order re 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611038562.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611038562.) by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 4, 2009 Filing 62 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Edmund J. Ferdinand III ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611038562.) filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 Stipulation filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. Opposition shall be filed by 11/6/09. Reply shall be filed by 11/13/09. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/2/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 60 STIPULATION & [Proposed] Order Adjusting Briefing Schedule On Cross-Motions To Compel And For Protective Order by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (White, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 13, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 12/2/2009. Further conference call scheduled for 11/6/2009 at 8:30 a.m. California time. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 7, 2009 Filing 59 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Rigler, Douglas) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 58 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motion Hearing (Docket #55) reset for 11/24/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 57 Proposed Order re 55 MOTION to Compel by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 56 Declaration of J. Scott Gerien in Support of 55 MOTION to Compel filed byBrowman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Related document(s) 55 ) (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 6, 2009 Filing 55 MOTION to Compel filed by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/25/2009 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 54 Second Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc. and Cavit Cantina. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 21, 2009 Filing 53 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Richard J. Collier as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 14, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2010 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 10/18/2010 08:00 AM. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2010 02:00 PM. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/14/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 Filing 51 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/11/2009 before Judge Jeffrey S. Whtie (Date Filed: 9/14/2009). (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/14/2009)
September 9, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 9/9/09. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Clerks Notice, 49 Stipulation filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/24/09. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Filing 49 STIPULATION re 48 Clerks Notice STIPULATION REGARDING RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND CANCELLATION OF HEARING by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Rigler, Douglas) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 48 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 Filing 47 CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2009 03:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/14/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 8, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER of Referral. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 8, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 7, 2009 Filing 44 Letter from Defendant Cavit and Plaintiff Browman, jointly. (Rigler, Douglas) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 2, 2009 Filing 43 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 32 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byBrowman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 24, 2009 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by RWS on 6/24/09. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 9/9/09 at 9:30 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 42 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 41 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing the Intitial Case Management Conference to 9/11/2009 at 01:30 PM. The updated Joint Case Management Statement is due by 9/4/2009. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/22/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting re 34 Pro Hac Vice Application. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 19, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Filing 38 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 17, 2009 Filing 37 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING WHETHER CASES ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/17/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 16, 2009 Filing 36 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 16, 2009 Filing 35 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/24/09 at 9:30 a.m. Please take note that the plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 12, 2009 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa identifying Other Affiliate Palm Bay International, Inc. for Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa, Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 12, 2009 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Browman Family Vineyards, Inc. byCavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 12, 2009 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 11, 2009 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Edward White for Cavit Cantina (White, Robert) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 11, 2009 Filing 29 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(White, Robert) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 11, 2009 Filing 28 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 10, 2009 Filing 34 MOTION of Douglas V. Rigler for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611033122) filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
June 8, 2009 Filing 27 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2009)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion and Accompanying Stipulation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2009)
June 1, 2009 Filing 25 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion and accompanying stipulation filed byCavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 22, 2009 Filing 24 RESPONSE to re 23 Response, to May 18, 2009 Filing by Defendant by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 18, 2009 Filing 23 Response re 21 Certificate of Service Objection to Service of Process and in the alternternative Motion to Dismiss byCavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 11, 2009 Filing 22 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing to 6/26/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
May 1, 2009 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc. re 4 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, Pursuant to the Hague Service Convention (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 28, 2009 Filing 20 Reply to Opposition filed byCavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 19 Declaration of Jaymie Kilgore in Support of 17 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byBrowman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 18 Declaration of J. Scott Gerien in Support of 17 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed byBrowman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Supplement 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 21, 2009 Filing 17 Memorandum in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed byBrowman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
April 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2009 01:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2009.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/7/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2009)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/6/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 6, 2009 Filing 14 Renotice motion hearing filed byCavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Affidavit of Robert Patch, # 4 Affidavit of Charles Tillery, # 5 Proposed Order)(Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/1/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 12 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 31, 2009 Filing 10 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ALL parties are instructed to sign and electronically file the enclosed consent or declination form within seven (7) calendar days of the date of this notice, indicating whether they consent to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge in this matter. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 24, 2009 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Declaration of Robert Patch, # 5 Declaration of Charles Tillery)(Goehring, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/24/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc. re 4 Summons Issued, 3 ADR Scheduling Order, 1 Complaint, (Gerien, J.) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 13, 2009 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 3/27/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
March 11, 2009 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 11, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 11, 2009 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 11, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/12/2009. Case Management Conference set for 6/19/2009 01:30 PM. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 11, 2009 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
March 11, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611029865). Filed by Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009) (hdj, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Browman Family Vineyards, Inc. v. Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Browman Family Vineyards, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Ferrigan Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cavit Cantina Viticoltori Consorzio Cantine Sociali Del Trentino Societa Cooperativa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?