Torgersen v. The Permanente Medica Group, Inc. Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan
Plaintiff: Naomi Torgersen
Defendant: The Permanente Medica Group, Inc. Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan
Case Number: 3:2009cv01228
Filed: March 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 44 Stipulation filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/17/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2010)
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER resetting cmc 41 Case Management Statement filed by Naomi Torgersen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
July 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE briefing schedule for MSJ re 38 Stipulation filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF MOTION(S) FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 36 Stipulation filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 Stipulation filed by The Permanente Medica Group, Inc. Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/17/2009. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting status conference from 12/2/09 to 12/23/09 re 28 Stipulation filed by Naomi Torgersen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/12/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 Stipulation filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/1/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 3 Stipulation filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/21/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torgersen v. The Permanente Medica Group, Inc. Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Torgersen
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Medica Group, Inc. Long-Term Disability Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?