Alowdi v. Able Building Services et al
Plaintiff: Foad Alowdi
Defendant: Able Building Services, Manilo Garcia and Robert Esquada
Case Number: 3:2009cv01258
Filed: March 23, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE REQUEST TO DISMISS ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S "RE-NOTICE" OF MOTION TO COMPEL [re 49 Renotice motion hearing filed by Foad Alowdi]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/24/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting 39 Motion to Amend/Correct; Plaintiff is required to E-FILE the amended document in three days]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING AMENDMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 16, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alowdi v. Able Building Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foad Alowdi
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Able Building Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manilo Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Esquada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?