Close v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Richard Close
Defendant: General Electric Company, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC and Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01269
Filed: March 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting: 77 STIPULATION re DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY filed by Richard Close Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/1/2014. General Electric Company terminated.(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/11/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 64 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Richard Close. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/21/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
August 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER remanding case back from the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, In re: Asbestos Products Liability Litigation (No. VI), MDL No. 875, and CASE REOPENED.(tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-322) by The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania & Assigned to the Honorable Eduardo C. Robreno for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407, In Re: Asbestos Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 875.***Civil Case Terminated. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Close v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Close
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?