Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Plan et al v. Acosta Sheet Metal Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Plan, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California, Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan and Bruce Word
Defendant: Acosta Sheet Metal Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01307
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER continuing cmc to 4/2/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting case management on 3/12/10 and order re: failure of payment (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2010)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Within 365 days from the date hereof, that the agreed consideration for the settlement ha not been delivered over, this order shall stand vacated, and the action shall be restored to the civil active calendar. Signed by Judge Illston on 7/10/09. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Plan et al v. Acosta Sheet Metal Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Health Care Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal Workers Pension Trust of Northern California
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 104 Vacation, Holiday Savings Plan
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Word
Represented By: Michael Joseph Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acosta Sheet Metal Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?