Perdana Capital (Labuan) Inc. v. Chowdry et al
Plaintiff: Perdana Capital (Labuan) Inc.
Defendant: Mohammad Akram Chowdry, Hi-Tech Venture Partners, LLC and Hi-Tech Associates LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv01479
Filed: April 3, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/25/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JDUGMENT.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 161 FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/28/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 143 THE DISCLOSURE AND DISCOVERY OF EXPERT WITNESS OPINIONS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/25/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE re 111 Letter filed by Perdana Capital (Labuan) Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/1/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES re 108 Stipulation filed by Mohammad Akram Chowdry. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/27/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER REGARDING NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND SCHEDULING. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2010. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/13/10. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE: 75 GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND NON-EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/28/10.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE: 47 CONTINUITNG MOTION HEARING TO 06/24/2010 AT 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 04/05/2010.(rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 39 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/7/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 33 Stipulation filed by Perdana Capital (Labuan) Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/4/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE SEPTEMBER 10, 2009 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 25 Stipulation filed by Perdana Capital (Labuan) Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/31/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINES FOR FILING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE re 14 Stipulation filed by Perdana Capital (Labuan) Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/10/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdana Capital (Labuan) Inc. v. Chowdry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perdana Capital (Labuan) Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Angel Kouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Akram Chowdry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech Venture Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?