Pet Food Express Limited v. Royal Canin USA Inc
Case Number: 3:2009cv01483
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn H. Patel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 WRIT of Execution issued as to Royal Canin USA Inc in the amount of $3,838,431.04. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 160 Plaintiff's Motion to Alter Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER RE JURY INSTRUCTION 22. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/2011. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DENYING 111 Proposed Order to amend trial schedule filed by Royal Canin USA Inc; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/28/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 85 PLAINTIFF'S Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 86 DEFENDANT'S Motion in Limine; denying 87 DEFENDANT'S Motion for Summary Judgment (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Jury Selection/ Jury Trial reset for 4/26/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Pretrial Conference reset for 4/21/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/28/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference continued to 8/23/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 6/4/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel denying 53 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 55 plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Further Case Management Conference RESCHEDULED FOR 6/7/2010 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/9/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/29/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pet Food Express Limited v. Royal Canin USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?