Proudfoot et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Case Number: 3:2009cv01492
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 25, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 23, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER TO CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING FROM CITY OF OAKLAND. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 21, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING DEADLINE FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING FROM CITY OF OAKLAND. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/26/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 3, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINES (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proudfoot et al v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?