Gabrielli v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marcello Gabrielli
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. and Chipotle Mexican Grill Service Co., LLC
Case Number: 3:2009cv01511
Filed: April 6, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Labor: Other Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Fair Labor Standards Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISMISSAL. The parties' stipulation to dismiss this action is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 9, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
June 23, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PARTIES' STIPULATION CONTINUING DATES FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING. The parties' stipulation to continue the deadline for plaintiff to file a Motion for Class Certification to and including July 19, 2010 is granted. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 23, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
January 28, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND CERTAIN CASE DEADLINES SET BY CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 28, 2010. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
October 2, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 14 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHN SHUNK PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
July 20, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The deadline to complete mediation is 90 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 20, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabrielli v. Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcello Gabrielli
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Jay Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipotle Mexican Grill Service Co., LLC
Represented By: Richard Jay Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?