Zynga Game Network, Inc. v. McEachern
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Defendant: Kyle McEachern
Case Number: 3:2009cv01557
Filed: April 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 95 Motion for Release of Bond Obligation.(sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2013)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Sealing Document (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/29/2009 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/5/2009. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re Plaintiff's Bond (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting preliminary injunction (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zynga Game Network, Inc. v. McEachern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zynga Game Network, Inc.
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle McEachern
Represented By: Kyle Madison McEachern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?