Nodal v. County Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Celso Nodal
Defendant: County Financial Services, Asset Recovery Specialists and Patrick Connick
Case Number: 3:2009cv01590
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/13/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT AUTOMOTIVE FUNDING GROUP, INC.dba COUNTY FINANCIAL SERVICES re 36 Stipulation filed by County Financial Services. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/15/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE and ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/5/2010. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SCHEDULING DEFAULT JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/21/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 23 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/17/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (ENE) re 16 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Early Neutral Evaluation filed by Celso Nodal. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nodal v. County Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celso Nodal
Represented By: Amir Vafaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asset Recovery Specialists
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?