Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland v. Clark County Self-Funded
Plaintiff: Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland
Defendant: Clark County Self-Funded
Case Number: 3:2009cv01603
Filed: April 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 16 by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and GRANTING Motion to Transfer. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation TO MODIFY DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO ATTEND EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION VIA ELECTRONIC MEANS Signed by Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 9/11/2009. (wdblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/2/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pers'l Jurisdiction, OR in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 27, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland v. Clark County Self-Funded
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Children's Hospital and Research Center at Oakland
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Self-Funded
Represented By: Lawrence J. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?