Doble et al v. Mega Life and Health Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Richard W. Doble, Jr. and Rochelle N. Doble
Defendant: Mega Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv01611
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Insurance Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER to extend date for dismissal of case until 1/24/2011 re 201 Stipulation filed by Rochelle N. Doble, Richard W. Doble, Jr.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/19/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER to extend date for dismissal of case re 199 Stipulation filed by Rochelle N. Doble, Richard W. Doble, Jr.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/20/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/19/2010. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 145 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and setting status conference. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER to extend date for filing joint proposed jury instructions re 169 Stipulation filed by Rochelle N. Doble, Richard W. Doble, Jr.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/26/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re 158 Stipulation filed by Rochelle N. Doble, Richard W. Doble, Jr., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 145 MOTION for Partial Summary Responses due by 10/12/2010. Replies due by 10/18/2010.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/8/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 80 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 90 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer finding as moot 117 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; finding as moot 117 Motion to Continue (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
July 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 7/14/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER to modify scheduling order re 71 Stipulation filed by Rochelle N. Doble, Richard W. Doble, Jr. Jury Trial set for 9/20/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2010 02:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/17/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 56 Objection, filed by Mega Life and Health Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on April 22, 2010. (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to extend time to answer or otherwise respond re 7 Stipulation filed by Mega Life and Health Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/11/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doble et al v. Mega Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Doble, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Kai Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle N. Doble
Represented By: Michael Kai Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?