Yates v. King of the Roll II et al
Plaintiff: Craig Yates
Defendant: King of the Roll II, Wayne Chang, Vanna Huang, John Wen, John C. Reynolds and Dolores A. Reynolds
Case Number: 3:2009cv01901
Filed: April 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Request for Dismissal of Retained Jurisdiction with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 33 Proposed Order filed by Craig Yates. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/25/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER RESETTING CMC FOR 10/27/10 re 31 Stipulation and Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/14/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
March 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CMC re 16 Proposed Order filed by Craig Yates. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/30/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. King of the Roll II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Yates
Represented By: Timothy Squire Thimesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King of the Roll II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanna Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores A. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?