Link v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Gustave W. Link
Defendant: State of California, Edmund Jerry G. Brown, Julian O. Standen, Anne Quick, Les Denherder, Carl Goff, Diana Kimble, John C. Duncan and John W. Cummings
Case Number: 3:2009cv01912
Filed: May 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 CLERK'S JUDGMENT:The instant action is hereby DISMISSED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS; DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Any First Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than August 21, 2 009. The Case Management Conference is continued from August 21, 2009 to November 6, 2009; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than October 30, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 6, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 18, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION; CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS FROM JUNE 26, 2009 TO JULY 31, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 11, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Link v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustave W. Link
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund Jerry G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian O. Standen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Quick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Denherder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?