Impey v. Office Depot, Inc.
Plaintiff: Daniel Impey
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv01973
Filed: October 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawing Defendant's Bill of Costs and Order Taxing Costs re 249 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/17/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS XX AND YY AND A PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 189. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/31/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 211 SECOND ORDER FOLLOWING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/22/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 208 PERMITTING PROJECTION AND DOCUMENT CAMERA EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 08/18/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/11/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART re 154 motion to continue; the Court Orders that trial of this matter shall be limited to ten court days. The allocation and schedule of these ten court days will be determined at the pre-trial conference . Trial shall begin on September 6, 2011 as scheduled. On September 6, jury selection will be conducted and opening statements will be presented, but no client representatives or other witnesses need to be present and no witness testimony will be ta ken. There will be no trial on September 7, and witness testimony will begin on September 8. This will allow witnesses and client representatives to travel two days after the Labor Day holiday if they prefer, and will provide ten days for trial and two days for jury deliberation with Judge Laporte available. Should the jury deliberate beyond September 22 when the Court becomes unavailable, another judge will accept the verdict. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/20/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING ALL MOTIONS IN LIMINE, re 152 Stipulation filed by Office Depot, Inc. The parties are ordered to re-file said motions in limine by no later than 7/12/2011. The pretrial conference remain scheduled for 8/9/2011 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/6/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011) Modified on 5/9/2011 (cgk, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 53 [69-8] Motion to Seal Document as Moot (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge Laporte denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 81 Motion to Compel (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Laporte granting 79 Motion to Shorten Time (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re 74 Administrative Motion for Order Extending Time to Disclose Rebuttal Expert Witnesses & Extending Expert Discovery. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO HEAR MOTION TO COMPEL ON SHORTENED TIME, CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/26/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 Stipulation filed by Office Depot, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/10/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 27 Stipulation filed by Office Depot, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/21/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 24 Stipulation filed by Office Depot, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 10/19/09. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING Case Management Conference set for 10/20/2009 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/1/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND DISCOVERY RULES REGARDING INTERROGATORIES. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/22/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/26/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impey v. Office Depot, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Impey
Represented By: David John Becht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?