Rasheed et al v. The City of San Ramon et al
Plaintiff: Kareem Rasheed and Khalid Anwari
Defendant: The City of San Ramon, San Ramon Police Department, M. Gunning, Stephens, R. Ransom, A. Medina, Spencer Hill, Tony Hill, Guy Hunter and Eileen Hunter
Case Number: 3:2009cv02011
Filed: February 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REMANDING CASE AS TO REMAINING DEFENDANTS.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/26/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/20/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DISCHARGING OSC re 53 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/3/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/12/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/27/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER EXTENDING ADR DEADLINE & SCHEDULING CMC re 42 Stipulation filed by Eileen Hunter, Guy Hunter. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/6/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 23 Motion to Dismiss (as to state law claims only) (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE re 37 Stipulation filed by Khalid Anwari. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/1/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/9/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER VACATING 29 Order to Show Cause; ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE RE 23 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/11/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 23 MOTION to Dismiss, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/28/2010 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 1/21/2010.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 21 Stipulation filed by Kareem Rasheed. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING ADR DEADLINE re 19 Stipulation filed by Kareem Rasheed. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/18/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/16/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009) Modified on 9/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rasheed et al v. The City of San Ramon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kareem Rasheed
Represented By: Ghassan Othman Hasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalid Anwari
Represented By: Ghassan Othman Hasan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of San Ramon
Represented By: Noah G. Blechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Ramon Police Department
Represented By: Noah G. Blechman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gunning
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephens
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Ransom
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Medina
Represented By: James V. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Hunter
Represented By: Jeanne Marie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen Hunter
Represented By: Jeanne Marie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?