Berry v. Metcalfe
Plaintiff: Waymon Mickiangelo Berry, III
Defendant: R. Metcalfe
Case Number: 3:2009cv02027
Filed: May 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 39 EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 25, 2010. (mmcsecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 36 PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 6, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 14 DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION, 22 TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL, AND 27 TO STAY DISCOVERY; GRANTING 26 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE DISPOSITIVE MOTION; DIRECTIONS TO CLERK. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 29, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 10 DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 5, 2010. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE. The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve without prepayment of fees, a copy of the complaint in this matter, all attachments thereto, and a copy of this order upon defendant Correctional S ergeant R. Metcalfe at Salinas Valley State Prison. The Clerk shall also mail courtesy copies of the complaint and this order to the Attorney General's Office. Within ninety (90) days of the date this order is filed, defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment or other dispositive motion with respect to the claim found to be cognizable. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 2, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009) Modified on 10/5/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Metcalfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waymon Mickiangelo Berry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Metcalfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?