Gholson et al v. Mylan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Candace Gholson and Kristy Gholson
Defendant: Mylan, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02042
Filed: May 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT: Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2011. Status Report due by 2/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/31/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINES: Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 6/13/2011 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Daubert Mo tion Hearing set for 3/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/26/11. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 2, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Responsive Pleading. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 22, 2010. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 Stipulation FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TO EXTEND CASE MANAGEMENT AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/1/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/29/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO A RANDOMLY ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/21/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 15, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for James Craig Orr, Jr.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/19/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gholson et al v. Mylan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Gholson
Represented By: Clay Robbins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Gholson
Represented By: Clay Robbins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?