Provident Bank of Maryland v. The Vessel WET DREAM et al
Plaintiff: Provident Bank of Maryland
Defendant: The Vessel WET DREAM and Daniel Clark
Case Number: 3:2009cv02105
Filed: May 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER STAYING CASE AND VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/16/2012. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re 61 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Daniel Clark, Attorney David Bernhard Felsenthal terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/25/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER re 53 Request to appear ttelephonically filed by Provident Bank of Maryland. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/15/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2011)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 48 Notice of Bankruptcy filed by Daniel Clark. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/28/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 WARRANT of Maritime Arrest issued as to The Vessel Wet Dream. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provident Bank of Maryland v. The Vessel WET DREAM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Provident Bank of Maryland
Represented By: Dirck Joseph Edge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vessel WET DREAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?