Sullivan v. Washington Mutual Bank FA et al
Plaintiff: Katy Sullivan
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank FA, JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank of America, LaSalle Bank and California Reconveyance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv02161
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re 183 Letter. ADR referral remains in place. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/21/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2016)
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 174 Stipulation filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/9/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE THE ORIGINATION AND CLOSING OF THE NEW LOAN TO 1/31/16 filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company. Further CMC set for 2/11/16 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER re 155 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by California Reconveyance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER re 145 Notice of non-settlement filed by Katy Sullivan. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/30/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015) Copy e-mailed to Plaintiff.
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER (90 day conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/5/15. Copy e-mailed to Plaintiff) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Continuing OSC Hearing. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/5/2015 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/2015. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RESETTING OSC. Order to Show Cause Hearing reset for 1/29/2015 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2014)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER RESETTING OSC re 130 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Katy Sullivan Order to Show Cause Hearing reset for 12/11/2014 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/31/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RESETTING Order to Show Cause Hearing from 10/9/14 to Tuesday 11/4/2014 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER RESETTING CMC FOR 1/23/14 AT 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/16/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/19/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RESETTING CMC - re 112 Case Management Statement filed by Katy Sullivan Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER ALLOWING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR BY PHONE re 104 Proposed Order, filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank of America, N.A., California Reconveyance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 102 Stipulation filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank of America, N.A., California Reconveyance Company Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/11/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO APPEAR IN PERSON AT CMC ON 8/24/12 at 11:30 am. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER ALLOWING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR DEFENSE COUNSEL re 80 Notice (Other) filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ALLOWING APPEARANCE BY PHONE re 77 Joint Case Management Statement, filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, Bank of America, N.A., California Reconveyance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/13/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CIVIL STANDING ORDER for U.S. District Judge Edward M. Chen. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER RESETTING CMC re 64 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Bank of America, JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company Status Report due by 6/8/2011. Status Conference set for 6/15/2011 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 2/3/10 TO 3/10/10 re 42 Stipulation filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/1/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE to 3/1/10 40 Stipulation filed by Katy Sullivan. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/7/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 7 17 Defendants JPMorgan and Bank of America's Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/23/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 Stipulation filed by Katy Sullivan. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Washington Mutual Bank FA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katy Sullivan
Represented By: John Brian McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank FA
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaSalle Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?