Beaver v. Bank of the West Long Term Disability Plan
Plaintiff: Marylyn Beaver
Defendant: Bank of the West Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2009cv02177
Filed: May 18, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 5, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND VACATING HEARING Show Cause Response due by 8:00 a.m. on 8/12/2010.. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [re 61 Notice (Other) filed by Marylyn Beaver]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 7/16/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/8/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION AND REMANDING STD CLAIM TO PLAN ADMINISTRATOR by Judge Alsup denying 43 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
February 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR REMAND, STAYING PROCEEDINGS FOR LTD BENEFITS, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup denying 31 Motion to Remand (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PARTIES' STIPULATED REQUEST TO EXTEND DEADLINES FOR MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 4, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/29/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE FILING SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 17, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaver v. Bank of the West Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marylyn Beaver
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the West Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?