October 12, 2011 |
Filing
183
ORDER to continue deadlines re 178 Stipulation, filed by Lennar Corporation, Lennar Associates Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing
149
DISCOVERY ORDER re 147 Letter filed by Eric Gundersen, 148 Letter filed by Eric Gundersen. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/3/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
|
November 1, 2010 |
Filing
145
ORDER to Lift Stay and Request for Status Conference re 144 Stipulation filed by Eric Gundersen Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. The stay of proceedings is terminated and the previously ordered tolling period shall terminate on 11/12/2010. The Court approves the parties' stipulation to enlarge page limits. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/1/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
143
ORDER re 142 Stipulation to Stay Proceeding from 8/20/2010 to and including 11/12/2010 filed by Lennar Corporation, Lennar Associates Management, LLC.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/15/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing
139
ORDER Resetting Hearings, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 100 MOTION to Deny Class Certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23, 46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, 132 MOTION to Dismiss 59 MOTION for Hearing to facilitate collective action notice. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/22/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing
138
ORDER granting 125 plaintiff's Ex Parte Application. And Permission to file briefs not to exceed 25 pages both in opposition to plaitniff's motion for class certification and in reply to plaitniff's opposition to defendants' mot ion to deny class certification. Defendants' motion to deny class certification is continued to 11/12/10. The briefing schedule is altered accordingly. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on July 21, 2010. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
|
June 24, 2010 |
Filing
127
ORDER to continue hearingre 124 Stipulation, filed by Lennar Corporation, Lennar Associates Management, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 124 Stipulation, 46 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, 59 MOTION for Hearing to facilitate collective action notice. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/23/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing
123
ORDER re 121 Stipulation, filed by Lennar Corporation, Lennar Associates Management, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 121 Stipulation, 100 MOTION to Deny Class Certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/22/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
|
June 21, 2010 |
Filing
122
ORDER allowing filing of counterclaim re 67 Stipulation filed by Lennar Associates Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/21/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing
66
DISCOVERY ORDER re 65 Letter filed by Eric Gundersen. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/26/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
|
April 6, 2010 |
Filing
44
ORDER to continue CMC re 43 Stipulation filed by Lennar Corporation, Lennar Associates Management, LLC Further Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/6/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing
42
ORDER to Substitute Lead Counsel re 40 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Lennar Corporation, Lennar Associates Management, LLC,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/3/2010. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing
29
ORDER to continue ADR dealine and the further CMC re 27 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation, filed by Lennar Corporation, Lennar Associates Management, LLC Further Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/10/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing
21
ORDER Granting 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard Jennings Burch( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611035254.) filed by Eric Gundersen. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/11/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
19
ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR filed by Lennar Corporation, Lennar Associates Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/10/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2009)
|