Perry et al v. Schwarzenegger et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Paul T. Katami and Jeffrey J. Zarrillo
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Mark B. Horton, Linette Scott, Patrick O'Connell and Dean C. Logan
Case Number: 3:2009cv02292
Filed: May 22, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2011 820 USCA Case Number 11-17255 9th Circuit (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 819 ORDER of USCA. The District Court's September 19, 2011 812 Order is temporarily stayed pending consideration of appellant's emergency motion for stay pending appeal.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order 818 ORDER by Judge James Ware finding as moot 816 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 817 Motion to Expedite (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 23, 2011 817 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion for Stay Pending Appeal filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration In Support of Motion to Shorten Time, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 23, 2011 816 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Responses due by 10/7/2011. Replies due by 10/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-26, # 2 Exhibit 27-29, # 3 Exhibit 30-36, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 22, 2011 815 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 813 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 814 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 22, 2011 813 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 812 Order by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611064971. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order 812 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO UNSEAL DIGITAL RECORDING OF TRIAL; GRANTING LIMITED STAY re 771 USCA Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 19, 2011. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 1, 2011 811 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-29-2011, before Chief Judge James Ware. Court Reporter Connie Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2011. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 29, 2011 810 Minute Entry: Arguments heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order.Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 8/29/2011). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2011)
August 24, 2011 809 Letter from Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Enrique A. Monagas Authenticating Video Clips for the August 29, 2011 Hearing)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
July 20, 2011 808 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal for proceedings held on June 13, 2011 before Judge Ware.. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 18, 2011 807 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Theodore B Olson re Sarah E. Piepmeier, Esq. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 15, 2011 806 Brief Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion for Order Compelling Return of Trial Recordings filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 805 Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Publicly Release Trial Videotapes filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order 804 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 29, 2011 803 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Patrice Jeanine Salseda (Salseda, Patrice) (Filed on 6/29/2011)
June 27, 2011 802 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 800 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 notice of appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 27, 2011 801 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 800 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 797 Order on Motion to Vacate by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611061453. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 15, 2011 799 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/13/2011, before Judge James Ware. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2011. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 14, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Responses due by 7/15/2011. Replies due by 8/1/2011. Motion Hearing for Plaintiff's Cross Motion to Lift Protective Order set for 8/29/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. James Ware. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order 798 ORDER denying motion for order compelling return of trial recordings 771 USCA Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 14, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order 797 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT by Judge James Ware denying 768 Motion to Vacate (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 796 Minute Entry: Arguments heard, matter submitted, Court to issue order.Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2011 before James Ware (Date Filed: 6/14/2011) re 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment filed by Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/14/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order 795 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 792 Motion for Leave to File (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 27, 2011 794 Letter from Michael J. McDermott - Amicus Pro Se. (McDermott, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 793 Brief of Amicus Curiae The Bar Association of San Francisco In Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Vacate Judgment filed byThe Bar Association of San Francisco. (Balabanian, David) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 792 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae The Bar Association of San Francisco filed by The Bar Association of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Balabanian, David) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order 791 ORDER Excusing Appearance re 772 Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/26/11. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 790 Brief of Amici Curiae Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, AIDS Legal Referral Panel, API Equality LA, API Equality Northern California, Asian American Bar Association of the Greater Bay Area, Asian American Institute, Asian American Justice Center, Asian Law Caucus, Asian Pacific American Bar Association of Los Angeles County, Asian Pacific American Bar Association of Silicon Valley, Asian Pacific American Legal Center, Asian Pacific Islander Legal Outreach, Bay Area Association of Muslim Lawyers, The Black Women Lawyers Association of Northern California, The California Employment Lawyers Association, The Charles Houston Bar Association, Courage Campaign, Equal Justice Society, Family Equality Council, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Freedom to Marry, Gay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders, Impact Fund, Iranian American Bar Association, Korean American Bar Association of Northern California, Korean American Bar Association of Southern California, Law Foundation of Silicon Valley, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Lesbian & Gay Lawyers Association of Los Angeles, Marin County Bar Association, Marriage Equality USA, National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, Philippine American Bar Association of Los Angeles, Queens Bench Bar Association, Sacramento Lawyers for the Equality of Gays and Lesbians, San Francisco La Raza Lawyers Association, Santa Clara County Bar Association, Santa Clara County Black Lawyers Association, Society of American Law Teachers, Transgender Law Center, Vietnamese American Bar Association of Northern California, and Women Lawyers of Alameda County, in Opposition to Proponents' Motion to Vacate Judgment filed byBay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom. (Bass, Joren) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order 789 Modified ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 788 Motion for Leave to File. The parties shall submit their brief by 5/27/2011 as a separate docket entry. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 788 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, et al., in Opposition to Proponents' Motion to Vacate Judgment filed by Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Amici Curiae Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom,, AIDS Legal Referral Panel, API Equality LA, API Equality Northern California, Asian American Bar Association of the Greater Bay Area, Asian American Institute, Asian American Justice Center, Asian Law Caucus, Asian Pacific American Bar Association of Los Angeles County, Asian Pacific American Bar Association of Silicon Valley, Asian Pacific American Legal Center, Asian Pacific Islander Legal Outreach, Bay Area Association of Muslim Lawyers, The Black Women Lawyers Association of Northern California, The California Employment Lawyers Association, The Charles Houston Bar Association, Courage Campaign, Equal Justice Society, Family Equality Council, Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality, Freedom to Marry, Gay & Lesbian Advocates & Defenders, Impact Fund, Iranian American Bar Association, Korean American Bar Association of Northern California, Korean American Bar Association of Southern California, Law Foundation of Silicon Valley, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area, Lesbian & Gay Lawyers Association of Los Angeles, Marin County Bar Association, Marriage Equality USA, National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, Philippine American Bar Association of Los Angeles, Queens Bench Bar Association, Sacramento Lawyers for the Equality of Gays and Lesbians, San Francisco La Raza Lawyers Association, Santa Clara County Bar Association, Santa Clara County Black Lawyers Association, Society of American Law Teachers, Transgender Law Center, Vietnamese American Bar Association of Northern California, and Women Lawyers of Alameda County, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom, et al., in Opposition to Proponents' Motion to Vacate Judgment)(Bass, Joren) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 23, 2011 787 REPLY (re 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment ) filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order 786 ORDER by Judge James Ware granting 782 Motion for Leave to File Brief. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order 785 ORDER RE: SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 776 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Attorney Tamar Pachter for Mark B. Horton,Tamar Pachter for Linette Scott added. Attorney Kenneth C. Mennemeier and Andrew Walter Stroud terminated. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/16/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 13, 2011 783 Brief re 782 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., ACLU Foundation of Northern California, National Center for Lesbian Rights, and Equality California in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Jud filed byLambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.. (Related document(s) 782 ) (Renn, Peter) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 782 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., ACLU Foundation of Northern California, National Center for Lesbian Rights, and Equality California in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Judgment filed by Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.. (Renn, Peter) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order 781 ORDER RE: THE LODGING OF TRIAL TAPES re 777 Letter filed by Vaughn R. Walker. Signed by Judge James Ware on 05/12/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 780 Declaration of Enrique A. Monagas in Support of 779 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 779 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 779 RESPONSE (re 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion to Vacate Judgment filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 12, 2011 784 FILED UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT A to 777 (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 778 RESPONSE (re 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment ) filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr, Linette Scott, Kamala D. Harris, Howard Backer. (Powell, Daniel) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 777 Letter from Ephraim Margolin, counsel for Vaughn R. Walker. (Margolin, Ephraim) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 776 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Tamar Pachter (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 775 RESPONSE (re 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment ) PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS' MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Van Aken, Christine) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 10, 2011 774 Statement re 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment - Statement of No Position by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 3, 2011 773 Letter to Chief Judge James Ware on behalf of Media Coalition's Motion in Ninth Circuit. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 28, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Pursuant to 772 Order: Responses due by 5/13/2011. Replies due by 5/23/2011. Motion Hearing re: 770 , 771 set for 6/13/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 772 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re 770 USCA Order, 771 USCA Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on April 28, 2011. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/3/2011: # 1 COS) (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 771 ORDER of USCA (Attachments: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4, # 4 part 5, # 5 part 6, # 6 part 7, # 7 part 8, # 8 part 9, # 9 part 10)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 770 ORDER of USCA (amendment to 771 Order) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011) Modified on 4/28/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment. Responses due by 5/13/2011. Replies due by 5/23/2011. Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 27, 2011 Opinion or Order 769 ORDER Expediting Hearing re 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment. Signed by Judge James Ware on April 27, 2011. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 25, 2011 768 MOTION to Vacate Judgment filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 6, 2011 Opinion or Order 767 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2011)
March 14, 2011 766 STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Statement) by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order 765 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Ware for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
January 7, 2011 764 USCA Per Curiam Opinion. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order 763 USCA OPINION (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order 762 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 761 USCA Memorandum (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 760 USCA Memorandum Motion to Disqualify. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 757 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
December 1, 2010 EXHIBIT LOCATIONS: Shelf 80: 2 boxes Plaintiff;Shelf 84: one box Plaintiff + one box Plaintiff/Defendant + 2 black binders Plaintiff, 1 black binder Defendant;Shelf 87: one expando Defendant Intervenor; Shelf 88: 2 boxes Plaintiff and one box Defendant; Shelf 92: 2 boxes Plaintiff (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 756 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
October 22, 2010 Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 754 WRIT OF CERTIORARI. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 753 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 19, 2010 755 RECEIVED: REQUEST FROM USCA for Record on Appeal. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010) Modified on 10/22/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 752 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 751 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 750 USCA Case Number 10-16751 9th Circuit (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 749 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 748 USCA Case Number 10-16696 9th Circuit (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 3, 2010 747 Received Document from the Court of Appeal of the State of California, Third Appellate District. The petition for writ of mandamus is denied. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 2, 2010 746 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 5/22/2009 - 6/16/2010 before Judge Walker, re 713 Notice of Appeal, Transcript due by 9/3/2010. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
September 2, 2010 745 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy D Chandler and Change of Designated Local Counsel (Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 744 ORDER by Judge Walker granting 729 Motion for Extension of Time to File; finding as moot 732 Motion to Shorten Time; granting 742 Motion for Extension of Time to File (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 23, 2010 743 Memorandum in Opposition re 742 MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Bill of Costs, 729 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Attorney's Fees and Related Expenses filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brian W. Raum in Support of Defendant-Intervenors' Opposition to Motion to Enlarge Time)(Raum, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 742 MOTION for Extension of Time to File A Bill of Costs filed by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Enrique A. Monagas, # 2 Proposed Order)(Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 19, 2010 741 Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenor's Motions re Timing of Application for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 18, 2010 740 Reply Memorandum re 732 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Patrick O'Connell's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Motion to Shorten Time to Decide Plaintiffs' Motion to Enlarge Time, and Certificate of Service filed byPatrick O'Connell. (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 739 Reply Memorandum re 729 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Attorney's Fees and Related Expenses Defendant Patrick O'Connell's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Motion to Enlarge Time, and Certificate of Service filed byPatrick O'Connell. (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 736 Memorandum in Opposition re 732 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brian W. Raum in Support of Defendant-Intervenors' Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time)(Raum, Brian) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 735 Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenors' Motions re Timing of Application for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 17, 2010 734 Proposed Order re 732 MOTION to Shorten Time by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 733 Declaration of Enrique A. Monagas in Support of 732 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Related document(s) 732 ) (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 732 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 731 Proposed Order re 729 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Attorney's Fees and Related Expenses by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 730 Declaration in Support of 729 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Attorney's Fees and Related Expenses filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 729 ) (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 17, 2010 729 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Attorney's Fees and Related Expenses filed by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 16, 2010 738 NOTICE re bill of review and motion to dismiss filed by Carlvin Justice. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 12, 2010 737 NOTICE re move to nullify filed by Carlvin Justice. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 728 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. This action having come before and tried by the court and the court considered the same pursuant to FRCP 52(a), on August 4, 2010, ordered entry of judgment in favor of plaintiffs and plaintiff-intervenors and against defendants and defendant-intervenors and each of them, Doc #708, now therefore: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that: Defendants in their official capacities, and all persons under the control or supervision of defendants, are permanently enjoined from applying or enforcing Article I, § 7.5 of the California Constitution. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 727 ORDER by Judge Walker denying 705 Motion to Stay. The clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment forthwith. That judgment shall be STAYED until August 18, 2010 at 5 PM PDT at which time defendants and all persons under their control or supervision shall cease to apply or enforce Proposition 8. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010) (Main Document 727 replaced on 8/12/2010) (ewn, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 726 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 8/12/10,granting 520 Dft-Intervenors' Motion to Seal Defendant-Interventors' Revised Privilege Log. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 725 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 448 Motion to Seal. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 724 ORDER finding as moot 414 Motion to Seal Document ; finding as moot 482 Motion to Seal Document (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 10, 2010 723 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 719 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 USCA Appeal Notification Form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 722 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet electronically mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 721 STATEMENT OF RELATED CASE by Board of Supervisors of Imperial County, County of Imperial of the State of California, Isabel Vargas. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 720 Received Document: REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re 719 Notice of Appeal, by Board of Supervisors of Imperial County, County of Imperial of the State of California, Isabel Vargas. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 10, 2010 719 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 709 Order on Motion to Intervene, 708 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Board of Supervisors of Imperial County, County of Imperial of the State of California, Isabel Vargas. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611049132. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 6, 2010 718 Memorandum in Opposition re 705 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 717 Memorandum in Opposition re 705 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 716 Memorandum in Opposition re 705 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Powell, Daniel) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 715 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 713 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 notice of appeal notification form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 714 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet electronically mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 713 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 708 Order by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611048938.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 712 ORDER finding as moot 369 Motion to Withdraw (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 711 Joinder re 705 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Board of Supervisors of Imperial County, County of Imperial of the State of California, Isabel Vargas. (Monk, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 710 ORDER granting 706 Motion to Shorten Time. Plaintiffs, plaintiff-intervenor and defendants are DIRECTED to respond to Doc #705 on or before August 6, 2010. The clerk shall STAY entry of judgment herein until the motion to stay pending appeal has been decided. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 709 ORDER denying 311 Motion to Intervene (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 708 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 707 Letter from Theodore J. Boutrous Jr.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 3, 2010 706 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Peter A. Patterson in Support of Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Shorten Time, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
August 3, 2010 705 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 14, 2010 702 Letter from Charles J. Cooper. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
July 9, 2010 701 Letter from Theodore B. Olson re: Notice. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 700 Letter from Theodore B. Olson re: Gill v. Office of Personnel Mgmt, No. 1:09-cv-10309-JLT (D. Mass. July 8, 2010); Commonwealth of Massachusetts v. Dept of Health and Human Services, No. 1:09-cv-11156-JLT (D. Mass. July 8, 2010). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
June 30, 2010 699 Letter from Charles J. Cooper. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
June 29, 2010 698 Memorandum in Opposition re 696 MOTION Administrative Relief filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 697 Declaration of Peter A. Patterson in Support of 696 MOTION Administrative Relief filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Related document(s) 696 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 696 MOTION Administrative Relief filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 29, 2010 695 Letter from Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr. re Christian Legal Society v. Martinez, No. 08-1371 (U.S. June 28, 2010). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 6/29/2010)
June 24, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 24, 2010 694 Letter from Thomas Burke to Judge Walker. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 24, 2010 693 Amended Transcript of Proceedings held on June 16, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CSR, RPR, CRR, and Debra L. Pas, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 17, 2010 692 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 693 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on June 16, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CSR, RPR, CRR, and Debra L. Pas, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 6/17/2010) Modified on 6/24/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2010 691 TRIAL LOG OF CLOSING ARGUMENTS. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010).
June 16, 2010 690 Minute Entry: CLOSING ARGUMENTS held. Bench Trial completed on 6/16/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. (Court Reporter Debra Pas and Katherine Sullivan.) (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/16/2010)
June 15, 2010 689 NOTICE by Dean C. Logan LOS ANGELES COUNTY REGISTRAR-RECORDER/COUNTY CLERK'S WAIVER OF CLOSING ARGUMENT (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 15, 2010 688 RESPONSE to Question 12 to Plaintiffs and Proponents and Waiver of Closing Argument by Arnold Schwarzenegger , Mark B Horton, and Linette Scott. (Stroud, Andrew) (Filed on 6/15/2010) Modified on 6/15/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2010 687 Response re 677 Order Defendant-Intervenors' Response to Court's Questions for Closing Arguments byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 15, 2010 686 RESPONSE to re 677 Order Plaintiffs' and Plaintiff-Intervenor's Response to Court's Questions for Closing Arguments by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 685 ORDER DENYING Doc ##640-2, 642, motions to strike exhibits and related testimony. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 684 ORDER granting 673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 683 ORDER re 673 GRANTING amended motion to supplement the record. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order 682 ORDER denying request in 670 Letter filed by Media Coalition (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 8, 2010 681 WRIT OF CERTIORARI FILED. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 680 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 679 MANDATE of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 678 Schedule for closing arguments. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 677 Questions for closing arguments. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 3, 2010 676 Letter from Deputy Attorney General, Tamar Pachter to Chief Judge Walker. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 2, 2010 675 NOTICE by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo re 672 Order (Notice to Court Clerk re Plaintiffs' Request for a Copy of the Trial Recording) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 674 NOTICE by City and County of San Francisco NOTICE TO COURT CLERK FROM PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO RE USE OF VIDEO (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 673 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 -- List of Exhibits, # 2 Attachment 2 -- Unrestricted Documents, # 3 Attachment 3 -- Redacted Documents, # 4 Attachmnet 4 -- Amended Motion to Supplement the Record, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
May 31, 2010 Opinion or Order 672 ORDER to the parties. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2010)
May 24, 2010 671 Letter from Charles J. Cooper to Chief Judge Walker. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 18, 2010 670 Letter from Thomas R. Burke/Davis Wright Tremaine LLP for the Media Coalition to The Honorable Vaughn R. Walker, Chief Judge of the U.S. District Court. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 12, 2010 669 Reply Memorandum to Motion to Supplement the Record filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 10, 2010 668 Declaration of Nicole J. Moss in Support of 667 Reply Memorandum, filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 667 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 10, 2010 667 Reply Memorandum re 640 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike and/or Reconsider filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 10, 2010 666 Reply to Opposition To Motion To Strike filed byHak-Shing William Tam. (Thompson, Terry) (Filed on 5/10/2010)
May 7, 2010 665 Statement in Response to Proponents' Motion to Supplement the Record by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 664 Declaration of Peter A. Patterson in Support of 663 Notice (Other) filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Related document(s) 663 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 663 NOTICE by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 662 SUPREME COURT LETTER.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 6, 2010 661 Declaration of Therese M. Stewart in Support of 660 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 660 ) (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 660 Memorandum in Opposition PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS PROPONENTS AND DR. TAM'S MOTIONS TO STRIKE/RECONSIDER filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 6, 2010 659 Memorandum in Opposition re 640 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike and/or Reconsider, 642 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike and/or Reconsider filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 5, 2010 658 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dennis Hollingsworth re 656 Declaration in Support, 657 Received Order, 655 MOTION to Seal (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 657 Received Proposed Order re 655 MOTION to Seal by Dennis Hollingsworth. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010) (far, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2010 656 Declaration of Peter A. Patterson in Support of 655 MOTION to Seal filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Related document(s) 655 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 5, 2010 655 MOTION to Seal filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 3, 2010 654 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 28, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order 653 ORDER DISCHARGING 641 Order to Show Cause. The hearing scheduled for 5/3/2010 is VACATED. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 652 RESPONSE to re 650 Show Cause Hearing,,,,,, by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 30, 2010 651 RESPONSE to re 650 Show Cause Hearing,,,,,, by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 28, 2010 650 Minute Entry: Show Cause Hearing. 1.Plaintiffs and proponents shall inform the court not later than April 30, 2010 at noon PDT whether the No on 8 groups' production is in compliance with the court's March 5 and March 22 orders (Doc ##610, 623). 2. If plaintiffs and proponents inform the court that the No on 8 groups' production is not in compliance, the court will hold a further hearing on the contempt OSC, Doc #641, on May 3, 2010 at 10 AM PDT. 3. If the No on 8 groups' production complies with the court's March 5 and March 22 orders, proponents shall serve and file any supplement to the evidentiary record not later than May 5, 2010 at 5 PM PDT. Plaintiffs shall respond to proponents' submission not later than May 7, 2010 at 5 PM PDT, and proponents shall file any reply not later than May 12, 2010 at 5 PM PDT. At that time the evidentiary record shall be submitted and upon the court's rulings shall be closed. 4. Proponents' and Dr Tam's motions for leave to file motions for reconsideration, Doc ##640, 642, are GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall serve and file their opposition to the motions for reconsideration on or before May 6, 2010 at noon PDT, and proponents and Dr Tam may serve and file a reply on or before May 10, 2010 at noon PDT. 5. The court proposes closing arguments be held June 16, 2010 at 10 AM. The parties are to inform the court clerk promptly if that date is not agreeable. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2010)
April 27, 2010 649 RESPONSE to re 641 Order to Show Cause Response of Equality California and ACLU to Order to Show Cause, April 25, 2010 by ACLU Foundation of Northern California, Equality California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 26, 2010 648 Letter from Andrew Stroud, Counsel for Gov. Schwarzenegger re Telephonic Appearance. (Stroud, Andrew) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 647 WRIT OF CERTIORARI.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order 646 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 645 USCA Case Number 10-15649 9th Circuit (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order 644 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order 643 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 26, 2010 642 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike and/or Reconsider filed by Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Proposed Motion to Strike, # 4 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Terry) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 25, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Order To Show Cause Hearing re Contempt on The No on 8 groups for failing to produce documents as ordered set for 4/28/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2010)
April 25, 2010 Opinion or Order 641 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the No on 8 groups should not be held in contempt. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/28/2010 10:30 AM. Show Cause Response due by 4/27/2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2010)
April 23, 2010 640 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Strike and/or Reconsider filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Motion to Strike, # 3 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Proposed Motion to Strike, # 4 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Proposed Motion to Strike, # 5 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Proposed Motion to Strike, # 6 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 22, 2010 639 Statement re 634 Order Statement of Objectors in Response to April 17, 2010 Order by ACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, April 19 Letter, # 2 Exhibit B, April 20 Letter)(Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 22, 2010 638 NOTICE by City and County of San Francisco Notice of Joinder by Plaintiff-Intervenor City and County of San Francisco to Plaintiffs' Response to April 17, 2010 Order (Chou, Danny) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 22, 2010 637 RESPONSE to re 634 Order by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 22, 2010 636 Declaration in Support of 635 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 635 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 22, 2010 635 RESPONSE to re 634 Order of April 17, 2010 by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 17, 2010 Opinion or Order 634 ORDER DIRECTING the parties and nonparties to inform the court in writing not later than April 22, 2010 whether they have resolved outstanding discovery issues; DISCHARGING Doc #631. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2010)
April 16, 2010 633 Declaration of Jesse Panuccio in Support of 632 Response to Order to Show Cause, and Motion for Contempt filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 632 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 16, 2010 632 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal and Motion for Contempt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 631 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why the evidentiary record should not be closed. Show Cause Response due by 4/16/2010. Signed by Judge Walker on April 13, 2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 630 ORDER granting 370 Motion for Leave to File; granting 373 Motion for Leave to File; granting 374 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 375 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 377 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 382 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 383 Motion for Leave to File; granting 386 Motion for Leave to File; granting 537 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 539 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 550 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 551 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 554 Motion for Leave to File; granting 555 Motion for Leave to File; granting 558 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 561 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 562 Motion for Leave to File; granting 566 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 568 Motion for Leave to File; granting 570 Motion for Leave to File; granting 576 Motion for Leave to File; granting 128 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 29, 2010 629 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDERING FORM for proceedings held on 2/25/10 and 3/16/10 before Judge Walker. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 25, 2010 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 628 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 627 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 24, 2010 627 JOINT NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 623 Order, 610 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Equality California. (Filing fee $ 455; Receipt no. 34611043904). (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 626 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 16, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RMR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/22/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order 625 ORDER by Judge Walker granting 624 Motion to Stay. The court's March 22 order, Doc #623, is STAYED until March 29, 2010 to allow objectors to seek relief in the court of appeals. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 23, 2010 624 MOTION to Stay Discovery Order of Magistrate Judge Spero and Order Rejecting Objections Thereto Pending Appeal or, in the Alternative, for Interim Stay Pending Application for Stay to Court of Appeals filed by ACLU Foundation of Northern California, Equality California. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 623 ORDER denying objections to Doc #610 re 619 Objection filed by Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight, 614 Objection, filed by Equality California, ACLU Foundation of Northern California. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 16, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
March 16, 2010 622 RESPONSE to 619 Defendant-Intervenors' Objections to Magistrate Judge Spero's March 5, 2010 Order Granting Motion to Compel by Californians Against Eliminating Basic Rights. (Krogseng, Kari) (Filed on 3/16/2010) Modified on 3/17/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2010 621 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/16/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. PROCEEDINGS:Hearing on Third Party ACLU and Equality California's Objections to Magistrate Judge Spero's 3/5/2010 Order. The court heard argument from counsel. The court submitted the matter. The court to issue a written order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2010)
March 15, 2010 620 RESPONSE to re 614 Objection, by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 619 OBJECTIONS to re 610 Order on Motion to Compel by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 12, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 618 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker GRANTING doc 617 Motion for a hearing on objections to Magistrate Judge Spero's 3/5/2010 Order filed by Third-Party Equality California, doc #614. The Court therefore sets a hearing date of March 16, 2010 at 10:00 AM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
March 11, 2010 617 MOTION [ADMINISTRATIVE] to Set Hearing Date of March 5 or March 16, 2010 Re Objections to Judge Joseph Spero's March 5, 2010 Order re 614 Objection, filed by ACLU Foundation of Northern California, Equality California, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whittemore, Lauren) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 616 Declaration of LAUREN WHITTEMORE in Support of 615 Stipulation, and Stipulated Request for Order Shortening Time filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California, Equality California, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Related document(s) 615 ) (Whittemore, Lauren) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 615 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME and [PROPOSED] ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION by ACLU Foundation of Northern California, Equality California, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Whittemore, Lauren) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2010 614 OBJECTIONS to 610 March 5, 2010 Order of Magistrate Judge Spero of No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality: A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California and Equality California by ACLU Foundation of Northern California, Equality California. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 3/11/2010) Modified on 3/12/2010 (far, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 613 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-25-2010, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Connie McCarthy Kuhl, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2010. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order 612 ORDER denying 611 Motion for Reconsideration (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 9, 2010 611 MOTION for Reconsideration re 610 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 3/9/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 610 ORDER by Judge Spero granting 472 Motion to Compel. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 3, 2010 609 Declaration of GEOFF KORS in Support of 602 Motion Hearing, 546 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel filed byEquality California. (Related document(s) 602 , 546 ) (Whittemore, Lauren) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
February 26, 2010 608 Proposed Findings of Fact by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 607 Reply Memorandum to Amicus Curiae Filings filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 606 Proposed Findings of Fact by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 605 TRIAL BRIEF by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 604 Reply Memorandum to Amicus Submissions filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 603 EXHIBIT B - Structure of the No on 8 - Equality for All Campaign re 601 Declaration of James Brian Carroll in Support of Equality California's Opposition to Motion to Conpel filed byEquality California. (Related document(s) 601 ) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2010)
February 26, 2010 602 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 2/25/2010 before Joseph C. Spero re 472 MOTION to Compel filed by Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight. Motion submitted. (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/26/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 601 Declaration of JAMES BRIAN CARROLL in Support of 546 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Compel Compliance With Non-Party Document Subpoenas filed byEquality California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 546 ) (Whittemore, Lauren) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 600 ORDER GRANTING re 594 Letter filed by Mark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott for Andrew Stroud to appear telephonically on 2/25/10 at 2:30 PM before Judge Spero on the Motion to Compel. Court will initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/24/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 599 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 587 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Suzanne B Goldberg Pro Hac Vice representing National Gay and Lesbian Task Force as Amicus Curiae. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 598 Declaration of Geoff Kors in Support of 589 Order, 546 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel filed byEquality California. (Related document(s) 589 , 546 ) (Whittemore, Lauren) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 597 Declaration of ELIZABETH GILL SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH GILL IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF NO ON PROPOSITION 8, CAMPAIGN FOR MARRIAGE EQUALITY: A PROJECT OF THE AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA TO DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH NONPARTY DOCUMENT SUBPOENAS filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 596 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/20/10, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 595 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/20/10, before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber James Yeomans, Telephone number (415) 863-5179. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2010. (jjy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 594 Letter from Administration Requesting Telephonic Appearance. (Stroud, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 593 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Compel filed byCalifornians Against Eliminating Basic Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Harrison, James) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 592 Letter Brief re 561 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief (Correction of Numerical Error) filed byAmerican Association for Marriage & Family Therapy, California Division. (Related document(s) 561 ) (Kay, Kelly) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 591 Letter from STEPHEN V. BOMSE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. SPERO RE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 590 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Hearing on Dft-Intervenor's Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing re-set for 2/25/2010 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 589 ORDER. Signed by Judge Spero on February 11, 2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 588 Letter from STEPHEN V. BOMSE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. SPERO RE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order 587 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Suzanne B. Goldberg ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611042247.) filed by National Gay and Lesbian Task Force Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order 586 Letter from STEPHEN V. BOMSE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH C. SPERO RE HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order 585 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS 472 MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 2/22/2010 AT 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 584 Reply to Opposition re 472 MOTION to Compel filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jesse Panuccio)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 581 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 580 MANDATE of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 579 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 578 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 577 Letter from Stephen Bomse to Magistrate Judge Spero re Hearing on Defendant-Intervenors Motion to Compel. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 573 ORDER setting 2/26/10 as deadline to respond to amicus submissions. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 572 ORDER REFERRING Doc #472 to Magistrate Judge Spero. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 571 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald B. King re 557 Proposed Order, 556 Brief, 555 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae on Behalf of Plaintiffs Certificate of Service (Richmond, Diana) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 582 Brief filed byAsian Law Caucus. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 576 MOTION for Leave to File an Amici Curiae Brief filed by Asian Law Caucus. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 567 Brief re 566 Amended MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMICI CURIAE BRIEF BY THE ASIAN LAW CAUCUS, ASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LEGAL CENTE filed byASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LEGAL CENTER, ASIAN PACIFIC BAR ASSOCIATION OF SILICON VALLEY, Asian Law Caucus, Asian Pacific Islander Legal Outreach, Bienestar Human Services, California State Conference of the NAACP, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Japanese American Bar Association, La Raza Centro Legal, Mexican American Legal Defense And Education Fund, National Black Justice Coalition, South Asian Bar Association of Northern California, Zuna Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Addendum A)(Related document(s) 566 ) (Obstler, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 566 Amended MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMICI CURIAE BRIEF BY THE ASIAN LAW CAUCUS, ASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LEGAL CENTER, ASIAN PACIFIC BAR ASSOCIATION OF SILICON VALLEY, ASIAN PACIFIC ISLANDER LEGAL OUTREACH, BIENESTAR HUMAN SERVICES, CALIFORNIA STATE CONFERENCE OF THE NAACP, COALITION FOR HUMANE IMMIGRANT RIGHTS, JAPANESE AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, LA RAZA CENTRO LEGAL, MEXICAN AMERICAN LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, NATIONAL BLACK JUSTICE COALITION, SOUTH ASIAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF NORTHERN CALIFORNIA AND ZUNA INSTITUTE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Asian Law Caucus, ASIAN AMERICAN JUSTICE CENTER, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY, ASIAN PACIFIC AMERICAN LEGAL CENTER, ASIAN PACIFIC BAR ASSOCIATION OF SILICON VALLEY, Asian Pacific Islander Legal Outreach, Bienestar Human Services, California State Conference of the NAACP, Coalition for Humane Immigrant Rights, Japanese American Bar Association, La Raza Centro Legal, Mexican American Legal Defense And Education Fund, National Black Justice Coalition, South Asian Bar Association of Northern California, Zuna Institute. (Obstler, Peter) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 565 Proposed Order re 554 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Progressive Project and COLAGE as [proposed] amici curiae CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[548 and 553] by The Progressive Project. (Mitchel, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 564 Proposed Order re 562 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by National Gay and Lesbian Task Force Foundation. (Popik, Susan) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 563 Brief of Amicus Curiae filed byNational Gay and Lesbian Task Force Foundation. (Popik, Susan) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 562 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by National Gay and Lesbian Task Force Foundation. (Popik, Susan) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 561 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American Association for Marriage & Family Therapy, California Division. (Kay, Kelly) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 560 Proposed Order for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief ofUnitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry California; Unitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry Action Network, CA; Unitarian Universalist Association: California Faith for Equality; California Council of Churches; California Council of Churches Church IMPACT; Northern California Nevada Conference of the United Church of Christ; Southern California Nevada Conference of the United Church of Christ; General Synod of the United Church of Christ; Universal Fellowship of Metropolitan Community Churches; Pacific Association of Reform Rabbis; and Progressive Jewish Alliance by Unitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry California, et al.. (Isaacson, Eric) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 559 Brief of Amici Curiae Unitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry California; Unitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry Action Network, CA; Unitarian Universalist Association: California Faith for Equality; California Council of Churches; California Council of Churches Church IMPACT; Northern California Nevada Conference of the United Church of Christ; Southern California Nevada Conference of the United Church of Christ; General Synod of the United Church of Christ; Universal Fellowship of Metropolitan Community Churches; Pacific Association of Reform Rabbis; and Progressive Jewish Alliance filed byUnitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry California, et al.. (Isaacson, Eric) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 558 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs filed by Unitarian Universalist Legislative Ministry California, et al.. (Isaacson, Eric) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 557 Proposed Order re 555 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae on Behalf of Plaintiffs by Donald B. King. (Richmond, Diana) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 556 Brief of Amicus Curiae Justice Donald B. King, Retired, in Support of Plaintiffs filed byDonald B. King. (Richmond, Diana) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 555 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae on Behalf of Plaintiffs filed by Donald B. King. (Richmond, Diana) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 554 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Progressive Project and COLAGE as [proposed] amici curiae CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[548 and 553] filed by The Progressive Project. (Mitchel, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 553 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 554 . *** MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Progressive Project and COLAGE as [proposed] amici curiae filed by The Progressive Project. (Mitchel, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/3/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 552 Brief re 551 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief of American Civil Liberties Union, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., and National Center for Lesbian Rights filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Related document(s) 551 ) (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 551 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief of American Civil Liberties Union, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., and National Center for Lesbian Rights filed by ACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 550 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs filed by American Anthropological Association, American Psychoanalytic Association, The National Association of Social Workers, National Association of Social Workers, California, American Academy of Pediatrics, California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Freed, John) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 549 Letter from Stephen V. Bomse re motion by Defendants-Intervenors to compel compliance with document subpoena. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order 548 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 554 . *** MOTION for Leave to File Brief of the Progressive Project and COLAGE as [proposed] amici curiae filed by The Progressive Project. (Mitchel, Steven) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/3/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 575 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Professors of Family Law re 570 MOTION for Leave to File, 574 Brief (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 574 BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE filed byCalifornia Professors of Family Law. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 570 APPLICATION to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs and Statement of Interest of Amici Curiae filed by California Professors of Family Law. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 547 Declaration of JAMES CARROLL in Support of 546 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Compel Compliance With Non-Party Document Subpoenas filed byEquality California. (Related document(s) 546 ) (Whittemore, Lauren) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 546 Memorandum in Opposition re 472 MOTION to Compel Compliance With Non-Party Document Subpoenas filed byEquality California. (Whittemore, Lauren) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 545 Statement re 472 MOTION to Compel by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 544 Declaration of Elizabeth Gill in Support of Opposition of No on Proposition 8 a Project of the ACLU of Northern California to Defendant Intervenors Motion to Compel Compliance with Nonparty Document Subpoenas filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 543 Memorandum in Opposition re 472 MOTION to Compel Opposition of No on Proposition 8 a Project of the ACLU of Northern California to Defendant Intervenors Motion to Compel Compliance with Nonparty Document Subpoenas filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 542 Declaration of Kari Krogseng in Support of 541 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel filed byCalifornians Against Eliminating Basic Rights. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 541 ) (Harrison, James) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 541 Memorandum in Opposition re 472 MOTION to Compel filed byCalifornians Against Eliminating Basic Rights. (Harrison, James) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order ***Deadlines terminated re doc 539. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 540 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome Cary Roth (Roth, Jerome) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 539 First MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief 09-cv-2292 VRW filed by Michael James McDermott. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2010 02:27 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (McDermott, Michael) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order 538 RESPONSE to re 535 Objection by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order 583 EXHIBIT AMENDING re 569 Brief filed byMichael Wolf. (Related document(s) 569 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order 537 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief of Bay Area Lawyers for Individual Freedom; AIDS Legal Referral Panel; API Equality - Northern California; Asian American Bar Association of the Greater Bay Area; Asian Law Caucus; Bar Association of San Francisco; California Womens Law Center; Chinese for Affirmative Action; East Bay La Raza Lawyers Association; Equal Justice Society; Family Equality Council; Filipino Bar Association of Northern California; Freedom to Marry; Law Foundation of Silicon Valley; Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area; Legal Aid Society-Employment Law Center; Lesbian and Gay Lawyers Association of Los Angeles; Marriage Equality USA; National LGBT Bar Association; Parents, Families and Friends of Lesbians and Gays (PFLAG) National; People for the American Way Foundation; Pride at Work; Sacramento Lawyers for the Equality of Gays and Lesbians; San Francisco Chamber of Commerce; San Francisco La Raza Lawyers Association; San Francisco Trial Lawyers Association; Santa Clara County Bar Association; Transgender Law Center; and the Vietnamese American Bar Association of Northern California, # 2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by BALIF et al.)(Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order 535 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Objections to Proponents' Deposition Counterdesignations of Daniel Robinson and Request for Additional Designations by Kristin M. Perry. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/29/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order 531 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 27, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order 530 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 26, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order 529 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 25, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order 528 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 11, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order 536 Trial Log. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order 534 Minute Entry: Bench Trial completed on 1/27/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Defense Rest. Post trial filings: Finding of Facts and Conclusions to be filed no later than 2/26/2010. Deadline to file amicus briefs: 2/3/2010. The court will set date for closing arguments. (Court Reporter Debra Pas, Katherine Sullivan.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/27/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order 533 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/26/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Further bench trial set for 1/27/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Date Filed: 1/26/2010). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order 526 ORDER to non-parties CAEBR, Equality California and the ACLU to respond to Doc #472 not later than 2/2/10. Plaintiffs may also file a response. Proponents' reply, if any, shall be filed not later than 2/5/10. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order 525 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 22, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order 524 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 21, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order 532 AMENDED Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/25/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 1/25/2010). (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order 527 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/25/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Further bench trial scheduled for 1/26/2010 at 8:30AM. (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/25/2010)
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 522 NOTICE by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2010)
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 521 Declaration of Nicole J. Moss in Support of 520 MOTION to Seal filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Related document(s) 520 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2010)
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 520 MOTION to Seal filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/24/2010)
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 519 MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Exclude Testimony of Frank Schubert filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amir C. Tayrani, # 2 Proposed Order)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/24/2010)
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 518 Proposed Order re 516 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Frank Schubert by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/24/2010)
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 517 Declaration of Amir C. Tayrani in Support of 516 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Frank Schubert filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 516 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/24/2010)
January 24, 2010 Opinion or Order 516 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Frank Schubert filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/24/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 569 BRIEF filed byMichael Wolf. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 568 MOTION for Leave to File as Amicus Curi filed by Michael Wolf. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 523 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/22/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Further bench trial set for Monday, 1/25/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Date Filed: 1/22/2010). (Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 515 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 514 MANDATE of USCA as to 253 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis Hollingsworth, 222 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hak-Shing William Tam, Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 513 MANDATE of USCA as to 253 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis Hollingsworth, 222 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hak-Shing William Tam, Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 512 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order 511 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order 510 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/21/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Further bench trial set for 1/22/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Date Filed: 1/21/2010). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order 508 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed on 1/21/10,granting 475 Dft-Intervenor's Motion to Seal Portions of the Declaration of Ronald Prentice, dated Jan. 16, 2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order 507 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 20, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order 506 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 19, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order 505 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 15, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order 504 Statement Second Supplemental Designation of Discovery Excerpts by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/21/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 509 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/20/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Further bench trial set for 1/21/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Date Filed: 1/20/2010). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 503 Exhibit List Third Supplemental by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 502 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 1/20/10,denying without prejudice 404 James Garlow's Motion to Quash; denying without prejudice 407 Miles McPherson's Motion to Quash (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 501 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2010 before Joseph C. Spero re 404 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order filed by James L Garlow, and 407 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order filed by Miles McPherson. Motions DENIED. Court to prepare Order. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 500 AMENDED Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2009 before Joseph C. Spero re: Dft-Intervenor's Motion to Amend/Correct January 8, 2010 Order [Docket No. 474]**Amended to correct clerical typing error from Plaintiff to Dft-Intervenor(Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 499 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 1/20/2010,granting in part and denying in part 474 Motion to Amend/Correct January 8, 2010 Discovery Order. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 497 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/20/2010 before Joseph C. Spero re 474 MOTION to Amend/Correct Order of January 8, 2010 filed by Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight. Motion granted in part, denied in part. Court to prepare Order.NOTE: Court construced Motion to Amend as a Motion for Reconsideration. (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 496 ORDER re 446 Objection filed by Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 495 Declaration of Ronald Prentice in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 494 Declaration of Nicole J. Moss in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 493 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 492 Exhibit List (Fifth Supplemental) by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 498 Minute Entry: Further Bench Trial held on 1/19/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker; further bench trial set for 1/20/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Date Filed: 1/19/2010). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 491 Memorandum in Opposition re 473 MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Compel filed byEquality California. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Leslie Kramer ISO Third Party Equality California's Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motin to Shorten Time, # 2 Exhibit A to Kramer Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Kramer Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Kramer Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Kramer Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Kramer Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Kramer Declaration)(Kramer, Leslie) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 488 Memorandum in Opposition of No on Proposition 8, Campaign for Marriage Equality: A Project of the American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion to Shorten Time for Motion to Compel Compliance with Nonparty Document Subpoenas filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Bomse, Stephen) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 487 Proposed Order re 485 MOTION to Shorten Time by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 486 Declaration of Rebecca Justice Lazarus in Support of 485 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Related document(s) 485 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 485 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 484 Proposed Order re 482 MOTION to Seal Document 480 Declaration in Support,, 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) MOTION to Seal Document 480 Declaration in Support,, 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) MOTION to Seal Document 480 Declaration in Support,, 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 483 Declaration in Support of 482 MOTION to Seal Document 480 Declaration in Support,, 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) MOTION to Seal Document 480 Declaration in Support,, 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) MOTION to Seal Document 480 Declaration in Support,, 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Related document(s) 482 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 482 MOTION to Seal Document 480 Declaration in Support,, 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 481 Proposed Order re 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 480 Declaration of Rebecca Justice Lazarus in Support of 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) (Public Version, Redacted Documents Not Included) filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Related document(s) 479 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 479 MOTION for Discovery (REDACTED Motion for Leave to Reopen the Deposition of Ronald Prentice in His Personal Capacity and as the Rule 30(b)(6) Representative for ProtectMarriage.com) filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 478 Declaration of Rebecca Justice Lazarus in Support of 477 Memorandum in Opposition to Proponents' Motion to Amend Discovery Order filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Related document(s) 477 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order 477 Memorandum in Opposition re 474 MOTION to Amend/Correct Order of January 8, 2010 filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order 476 MOTION to Shorten Time to respond to Motion to Amend Order of Jan. 8, 2010 filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/18/2010)
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order 475 MOTION to Seal Declaration of Ronald Prentice (Jan. 16, 2010) filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/18/2010)
January 18, 2010 Opinion or Order 474 MOTION to Amend/Correct Order of January 8, 2010 filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald Prentice)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/18/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Further Bench Trial set for 1/19/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 490 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/15/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Further bench trial set for 1/19/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Date Filed: 1/15/2010). (Court Reporter Debra Pas and Kathy Sullivan.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2010) .
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 473 MOTION to Shorten Time re Motion to Compel filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 472 MOTION to Compel filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 471 Declaration of Rebecca Justice Lazarus in Support of 470 Memorandum in Opposition filed byKristin M. Perry. (Related document(s) 470 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 470 Memorandum in Opposition Plaintiffs' Response to Proponents' Objections to Discovery Orders of Magistrate Judge Spero filed byKristin M. Perry. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 469 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 424 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Vincent P. McCarthy Pro Hac Vice representing non-party Dr Jim Garlow and Pastor Miles McPherson. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 468 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 422 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Paul Benjamin Linton Pro Hac Vice representing Family Research Council. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 467 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 421 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Christopher M Gacek Pro Hac Vice representing Family Research Council. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 466 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 420 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Thomas Brejcha Pro Hac Vice representing Family Research Council. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 465 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 419 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Kevin J. Hasson Pro Hac Vice representing Becket Fund for Religious Liberty. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 464 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 14, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order 463 Notice to parties. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 489 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/14/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker; Further court trial 1/15/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Date Filed: 1/14/2010). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 462 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 461 MOTION to Exclude Kendall filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Declaration, *** # 2 Exhibit B FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/14/2010) Modified on 1/15/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 460 ORDER re 446 . Plaintiffs are directed to respond to proponents' objections in writing not later than 1/15 at 4 PM. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 459 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 1/14/2010,granting 445 Dft-Intervenors' Motion to Seal Portions of the Declaration of Ronald Prentice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 456 Response re 413 Order ATTORNEY'S GENERAL'S MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S INQUIRY [DOC #413] INTO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL'S ROLE IN THE INITIATIVE PROCESS byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 455 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ATTENDANCE OF TRIAL by Defendant Patrick O'Connell, Clerk-Recorder of the County of Alameda re doc 360 filed by Patrick O'Connell. The attendance at trial by counsel of record for Defendant O'Connell Clerk-Recorder of the County of Alameda will not be necessary but may attend the hearing for selected arguments. Defendant O'Connell will continue to be served in the normal practice throughout the proceedings. Defendant O'Connell will be bound by the final judgment of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/13/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 454 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 13, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number Y. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 453 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 12, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/14/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order 452 Letter from Charles J. Cooper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 458 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/13/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker ; continued for further court trial on 1/14/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 451 Exhibit List (Fourth Supplemental) by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 450 Reply to Opposition to 369 Motion to Withdraw filed by Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Terry L. Thompson, # 2 Exhibit e-mails, # 3 Exhibit Agreement to Appear, # 4 Exhibit e-mails)(Thompson, Terry) (Filed on 1/13/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 449 Joint Reply of Non-Parties James L. Garlow and Miles McPherson to Plaintiff's Opposition to their 407 MOTIONS to Quash Subpoenas and for Protective Order filed by James L Garlow. (Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 1/13/2010) Modified on 1/14/2010 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 448 MOTION to Seal Ronald Prentice Declaration of Jan. 13, 2010 filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 447 Reply Memorandum re 414 MOTION to Seal Document or for entry of document into public record filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 446 OBJECTIONS to Discovery Orders of Magistrate Judge Spero by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order 445 MOTION to Seal Portions of Declaration of Ronald Prentice filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/13/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 457 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/12/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker ; Further trial set for 1/13/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 444 Declaration of Kaiponanea T Matsumura in Support of 443 Memorandum in Opposition, to Motions to Quash filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 443 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 443 Memorandum in Opposition re 404 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Criswell (Doc 351), Garlow (Doc 404), McPherson (Doc 407) filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 442 Declaration of Rebecca Justice Lazarus in Support of 441 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Withdraw filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 441 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 441 Memorandum in Opposition re 369 MOTION to Withdraw filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 440 Exhibit List Second Supplemental by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 439 Alameda County Bar Association comment re Civ LR 77-3. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 438 ORDER by Judge Walker directing proponents to respond to Doc #414. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 437 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. REFER TO DOCUMENT 440 . *** Exhibit List Second Supplemental by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/12/2010) Modified on 1/12/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 436 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James L Garlow re 404 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order (Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 435 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miles McPherson re 407 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order (Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 434 AMENDED OPINION of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 433 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 432 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 396 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Kaylan L Phillips Pro Hac Vice representing Doug Swardstrom. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 431 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 395 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Richard E Coleson Pro Hac Vice representing Doug Swardstrom. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 430 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 429 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 394 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney James Bopp, Jr. Pro Hac Vice representing Doug Swardstrom. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 428 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 427 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 426 MANDATE of USCA as to 168 Notice of Appeal, filed by Campaign for California Families, 253 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis Hollingsworth, 222 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hak-Shing William Tam, Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 425 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/12/2010. **See page 8, line 15 for amendment**(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 423 Statement Supplemental Designation of Discovery Excerpts by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 417 Declaration of Rebecca Justice Lazarus in Support of 416 MOTION to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents filed byKristin M. Perry. (Related document(s) 416 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 416 MOTION to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal Documents filed by Kristin M. Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 415 Declaration of Rebecca Justice Lazarus in Support of 414 MOTION to Seal Document or for entry of document into public record filed byKristin M. Perry. (Related document(s) 414 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 414 MOTION to Seal Document or for entry of document into public record filed by Kristin M. Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order 413 ORDER directing the Attorney General to respond to the court's question not later than January 14, 2010 at 5 PM. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 424 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Vincent P. McCarthy ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040926.) filed by Miles McPherson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Further Bench Trial set for 1/12/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 418 Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 1/11/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Opening statements. Further bench trial set for 1/12/2010 at 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan and Debra Pas.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 412 Exhibit List (Third Supplemental) by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 411 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 528 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on January 11, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan and Debra L. Pas, Official Reporters, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/11/2010) Modified on 1/28/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 410 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ATTENDANCE OF TRIAL BY Defendant Dean C Logan, Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk re doc 357 Stipulation filed by Dean C. Logan. The attendance at trial by counsel of record for Defendant Dean C Logan, the Los Angeles County Clerk, will not be necessary, but Logan's counsel may attend the hearing for selected arguments. Defendant County Registrar will continue to be served in the normal practice throughout the proceedings. Defendant County Registrar will be bound by the final judgment of the Court in this matter. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/11/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 409 ORDER directing plaintiffs to respond to Doc #369, Doc #354, Doc #404 and Doc #407 not later than January 13, 2010 at 9 AM (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 408 Letter from Thomas R. Burke to Hon. Phyllis Hamilton and Hon. Vaughn Walker re Comments on Proposed Revision of Northern District of California Civil Local Rule 77-3 w/attachments A-D. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1 of 4, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2 of 4, # 5 Exhibit C Part 3 of 4, # 6 Exhibit C Part 4 of 4, # 7 Exhibit D)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 407 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order filed by Miles McPherson. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Miles McPherson in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena, # 2 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Miles McPherson's Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Brian R. Chavez-Ochoa in Support of Motion to Shorten Time, # 4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order - Motion of Miles McPherson to Quash Subpoena to Appear and Testify and for Protective Order)(Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 406 Letter from Judge Kozinski re 405 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 405 Letter from J Duff re Civ LR 77-3 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 404 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order filed by James L Garlow. Motion Hearing set for 1/14/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of James L. Garlow in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena, # 2 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of James L. Garlow's Motion to Quash Subpoena and For Protective Order, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Brian R. Chavez-Ochoa in Support of Motion to Shorten Time, # 4 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order - Motion of James L. Garlow to Quash Subpoena to Appear and Testify and for Protective Order)(Chavez-Ochoa, Brian) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 403 ACLU comment re Civ LR 77-3 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 402 Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area comment re Civ LR 77-3 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 401 The Bar Association of San Francisco comment re Civ LR 77-3 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 400 Equal Justice Society comment re Civ LR 77-3 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 399 Federal Bar Association comment re Civ LR 77-3 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 398 Witness List by Dennis Hollingsworth, Gail J. Knight, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order 397 Letter from Charles J. Cooper. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
January 9, 2010 Opinion or Order 393 MOTION to Amend/Correct 361 Protective Order filed by City and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 1/9/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 422 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Paul Benjamin Linton ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040920.) filed by The Family Research Council. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 421 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Christopher M. Gacek ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040916.) filed by The Family Research Council. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 420 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Thomas Brejcha ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040919.) filed by The Family Research Council. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 419 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Kevin James Hasson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040918.) filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 392 Statement of Supplemental Designation of Discovery Excerpts by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 391 ORDER re 390 . Counsel should consult the court's IT department; assuming its approval and the absence of objection by any party, the court will approve the request, subject to internet access being made available on an equal basis to all parties. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 390 Letter from JEREMY M. GOLDMAN re Courtroom Internet Access. (Goldman, Jeremy) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 389 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Institute for Marriage and Public Policy re 388 Brief, 386 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE, 387 Proposed Order DECLARATION OF SERVICE (Moreno, Jose) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 388 Brief re 386 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE, 387 Proposed Order BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE filed byInstitute for Marriage and Public Policy. (Related document(s) 386 , 387 ) (Moreno, Jose) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 387 Proposed Order re 386 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE by Institute for Marriage and Public Policy. (Moreno, Jose) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 386 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE filed by Institute for Marriage and Public Policy. (Moreno, Jose) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 385 Proposed Order re 383 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae by Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention. (Llewellyn, David) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 384 Brief re 383 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae filed byEthics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention. (Related document(s) 383 ) (Llewellyn, David) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 383 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amicus Curiae filed by Ethics and Religious Liberty Commission of the Southern Baptist Convention. (Llewellyn, David) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 382 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 378 filed by National Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants, # 2 Proposed Order)(Carmichael, Holly) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 381 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Hak-Shing William Tam. Motion Hearing set for 1/12/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Terry L. Thompson in Support of Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Service)(Thompson, Terry) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 380 Proposed Order re 377 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Paul R. McHugh. (Schweickert, Christopher) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 379 Brief re 377 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed byPaul R. McHugh. (Related document(s) 377 ) (Schweickert, Christopher) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 378 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 382 . *** MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by National Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants)(Carmichael, Holly) (Filed on 1/8/2010) Modified on 1/8/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 377 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Paul R. McHugh. (Schweickert, Christopher) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 376 Brief re 375 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant-Intervenors filed byThe Becket Fund for Religious Liberty. (Related document(s) 375 ) (Thompson, Angela) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 375 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant-Intervenors filed by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Angela) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 374 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by American College of Pediatricians. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)(Snider, Kevin) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 373 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae National Organization for Marriage, Inc. filed by Charles S LiMandri. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Pre-Trial Memorandum of Pionts & Authorities, # 3 Declaration of Service)(LiMandri, Charles) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 372 ORDER re 325 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Spero on January 8, 2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 371 MOTION to Stay Public Broadcast filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 370 MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Trial Brief As Amicus Curiae filed by The Family Research Council. (Attachments: # 1 Pre-Trial Brief, # 2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Decl. of Paul B. Linton, # 3 Proposed Order)(Gorman, Patrick) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 369 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Hak-Shing William Tam. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A Appellees' Oppositon to Appellants' Emergency Motion, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Tam in Support of Motion, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Declaration of Service)(Thompson, Terry) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 368 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick O'Connell re 360 Stipulation, and [Proposed] Order Attendance of Trial (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 367 Letter from Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., Counsel for Plaintiffs, to The Hon. Joseph C. Spero. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order 366 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 1/6/2010 before Joseph C. Spero re: Docket No. 325 Dft-Intervenor's Privilege Log. Court to issue written order. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 365 Exhibit List (Second Supplemental) by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 364 NOTICE by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal of Filing of Redacted Declaration (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ronald Prentice)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 363 Transcript of Proceedings held on January 6, 2010, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 362 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-6-2010, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CSR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2010. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 361 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/7/10. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 360 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Attendance of Trial by Defendant Patrick O'Connell Clerk-Recorder of the County of Alameda by Patrick O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 359 NOTICE by Edmund G. Brown, Jr ATTORNEY GENERAL'S NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO APPLICATIONS TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFS (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 358 Notice to parties. Signed by Judge Walker on January 7, 2010. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order 357 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Attendance of Trial by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order 396 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Kaylan L. Phillips ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040770.) filed by Doug Swardstrom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order 395 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Richard E. Coleson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040770.) filed by Doug Swardstrom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order 394 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of James Bopp, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040770.) filed by Doug Swardstrom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order 356 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Terry Lee Thompson (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Thompson, Terry) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order 355 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2010 before Chief Judge Vaughn R. Walker (Date Filed: 1/6/2010) re 339 First MOTION to Compel filed by Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry; 311 MOTION to Intervene filed by County of Imperial of the State of California, Isabel Vargas, Board of Supervisors of Imperial County. (Court Reporter Kathryn Sullivan) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order 354 Third Party MOTION to Shorten Time to Quash Subpoena filed by William T. Criswell. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Bunim, David) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 6, 2010 Opinion or Order 353 Letter from James Bopp, Jr. re Doug Swardstrom's Opposition to Recording Proceedings. (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 352 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Doug Swardstrom. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric Grant, # 2 Declaration of James Bopp, Jr., # 3 Proposed Order)(Grant, Eric) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 351 Third Party MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Appear filed by William T. Criswell. Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Bunim, David) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 350 Reply Memorandum filed byBoard of Supervisors of Imperial County, County of Imperial of the State of California, Isabel Vargas. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Monk, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 349 Memorandum in Opposition re 339 First MOTION to Compel filed byDoug Swardstrom. (Grant, Eric) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 348 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 314 ) (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 347 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting 345 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Kirk (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 346 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R. Walker granting 344 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Dale M. Schowengerdt (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 345 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. Kirk ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040684.) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order 343 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' DOCUMENT REQUESTS re 325 Response ( Non Motion ) filed by Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, City and County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/5/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 344 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Dale M. Schowengerdt ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611040651.). (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 342 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo re 339 First MOTION to Compel (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 341 Proposed Order re 339 First MOTION to Compel by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 340 Declaration of Ethan D. Dettmer in Support of 339 First MOTION to Compel filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 339 ) (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 339 First MOTION to Compel filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 338 ORDER re 311 motion to intervene filed by Imperial County; granting leave to file motion to compel re 333 (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 337 ERRATA re 330 Exhibit List, by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order 336 Letter from Charles J. Cooper. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order 335 Request for Judicial Notice re 334 Response in Support of Request for Order Permitting Television Coverage of The Trial and Declaration of Thomas R. Burke filed byMedia Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, Part One, # 5 Exhibit D, Part Two, # 6 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 334 ) (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order 334 RESPONSE in Support of Request for Order Permitting Television Coverage of the Trial (Memorandum of Points and Authorities) filed byMedia Coalition. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 31, 2009 Opinion or Order 333 Letter from Ethan D. Dettmer re Motion to Compel the Deposition of Doug Swardstrom. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/31/2009)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 332 ORDER regarding the ongoing discovery dispute and potential recording of the January 6 hearing. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 331 RESPONSE in Support re 311 MOTION to Intervene filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 330 Exhibit List (Supplemental) by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Exhibit List)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 329 Declaration of Kaiponanea T. Matsumura in Support of 328 Memorandum in Opposition re Motion to Intervene filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 328 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 328 Memorandum in Opposition re 311 MOTION to Intervene filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 327 Letter from Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 326 Letter from Charles J. Cooper. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 325 RESPONSE to re 314 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 324 Letter from Charles J. Cooper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - 2007 9th Cir. Resolution re Cameras, # 2 Exhibit B - 7-23-09 Duff Letter to Leahy & Sessions)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 323 Statement of Non-Opposition Statement of No Opposition by Defendant Patrick O'Connell, Clerk-Recorder of the County of Alameda's Motion to Intervene of Imperial County and Certificate of Service filed byPatrick O'Connell. (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 322 ERRATA re 314 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 321 Statement of Non-Opposition re 311 MOTION to Intervene filed byDean C. Logan. (Related document(s) 311 ) (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order 320 Statement re 311 MOTION to Intervene ATTORNEY GENERAL'S STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO INTERVENE OF IMPERIAL COUNTY by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 proof of service)(Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 319 ORDER by Judge Walker denying 216 Motion to Realign the Attorney General (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 318 Exhibit List (Supplemental) by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 316 Statement of Non-Opposition re 311 MOTION to Intervene filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Related document(s) 311 ) (Stroud, Andrew) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 315 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/16/09, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 314 NOTICE by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam of Filing of Privilege Log (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 313 Letter from Thomas R. Burke for the Media Coalition as interested party to Chief Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 317 Minute Entry: Hearing held on the Motion to Intervene filed by Imperial County, doc #311 and Motion to Realign the Attorney General on 12/16/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Interim Pretrial Conference held on 12/16/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker ; the court submitted the matter, the court to issue written ruling. (Date Filed: 12/16/2009). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2009)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 312 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by Board of Supervisors of Imperial County, County of Imperial of the State of California, Isabel Vargas. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of J. Monk, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 311 MOTION to Intervene filed by County of Imperial of the State of California, Board of Supervisors of Imperial County, Isabel Vargas. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of W. Leimgruber, # 2 Declaration of I. Vargas, # 3 Proposed Answer to SF, # 4 Proposed Answer to Plaintiff, # 5 Proposed Order)(Tyler, Robert) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 310 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 309 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 308 ORDER of USCA (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 307 ORDER of USCA as to 253 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis Hollingsworth (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 306 USCA OPINION. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 305 USCA Case Number 09-17551 9th Circuit for 253 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dennis Hollingsworth. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 304 Memorandum in Opposition re 280 MOTION in Limine filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 303 Declaration of Peter A. Patterson in Support of 302 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Related document(s) 302 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 302 Memorandum in Opposition re 285 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS, OPINIONS, AND TESTIMONY OF KATHERINE YOUNG, LOREN MARKS AND DAVID BLANKENHORN filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 301 RESPONSE to re 294 Statement of Objections to Evidence by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 300 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re: Demonstrative Exhibits by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 299 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING RULE 26 DISCLOSURES re doc 265 filed by Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/8/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 298 Letter from Ethan D. Dettmer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 297 Letter from Jesse Panuccio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 296 Proposed Order re 280 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Kenneth P. Miller by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Goldman, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/8/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 295 TRIAL BRIEF by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 294 Statement of Objections to Evidence by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 293 Statement of Designation of Discovery Excerpts by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 292 Witness List by Dennis Hollingsworth, Gail J. Knight, Hak-Shing William Tam, Mark A. Jansson, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 291 Exhibit List by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 290 Proposed Findings of Fact by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 289 Letter from Ethan D. Dettmer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 288 Statement of Designation of Discovery Excerpts by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 287 Proposed Order re 285 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS, OPINIONS, AND TESTIMONY OF KATHERINE YOUNG, LOREN MARKS AND DAVID BLANKENHORN by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 286 Declaration of Rebecca Justice Lazarus in Support of 285 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS, OPINIONS, AND TESTIMONY OF KATHERINE YOUNG, LOREN MARKS AND DAVID BLANKENHORN filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 285 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 285 MOTION in Limine TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORTS, OPINIONS, AND TESTIMONY OF KATHERINE YOUNG, LOREN MARKS AND DAVID BLANKENHORN filed by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 284 Witness List by Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Sandra B. Stier, City and County of San Francisco, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 283 Exhibit List by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 282 Proposed Findings of Fact by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 281 TRIAL BRIEF by City and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 280 MOTION in Limine filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jeremy M. Goldman, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration)(Goldman, Jeremy) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 279 TRIAL BRIEF by Mark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 278 Letter from Edmund G. Brown Jr. material allegations. (Attachments: # 1 declaration of service)(Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 277 TRIAL BRIEF Trial Memorandum of Defendant Patrick O'Connell, Clerk-Recorder of the County of Alameda and Certificate of Service by Patrick O'Connell. (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 276 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dean C. Logan re 275 Trial Brief (Service by Mail) (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 275 TRIAL BRIEF by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 274 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmund G. Brown, Jr re 272 Letter dated December 3, 2009 (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 273 Letter from Ronald P. Flynn. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 272 Letter from Attorney General Edmund G. Brown Jr. re Proposed Protective Orders. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 12/3/2009)
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 271 Letter from Ronald P. Flynn. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 270 Letter from Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 269 Letter from Ethan D. Dettmer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 268 Letter from Manuel F. Martinez Defendant Patrick O'Connell's, in his Official Capacity as Clerk-Recorder for the County of Alameda, Response to this Court's Order [Document 267] and Declaration of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Martinez, Manuel) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 267 ORDER directing the parties to submit their respective versions of a protective order not later than Tuesday, December 1, 2009 at 5 PM PST. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 266 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order To Extend Time Regarding Pretrial Filings by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Sarah E. Piepmeier)(Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 265 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING RULE 26 DISCLOSURES by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order 264 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/09, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2010. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 263 Letter from Therese M. Stewart, City and County of San Francisco in response to the letter sent by Defendant-Intervenors Prop. 8 Proponents (Doc. #260). (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 262 Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs to The Honorable Joseph C. Spero. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 261 EXHIBITS re 260 Letter filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Related document(s) 260 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 260 Letter from Nicole J. Moss. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 259 ORDER re 256 , 257 . The parties are directed to proceed with discovery as described in the order to conclude not later than November 30, 2009. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 258 Minute Entry: TelephonicDiscovery Hearing held on 11/19/2009 before Joseph C. Spero re: docket nos. 256 and 257. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 257 Letter from Nicole J. Moss. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 256 Letter from Ethan D. Dettmer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 255 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals by Dennis Hollingsworth re 253 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet, # 2 cover letter, # 3 USCA Appeal Notification Form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 254 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 253 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 252 Order, 237 Order on Motion to Stay, 214 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Dennis Hollingsworth. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611038935 Appeal Record due by 12/14/2009. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 252 ORDER re 251 in camera discovery review. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2009)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 251 NOTICE OF FILING of Sealed Documents For In Camera Review by Dennis Hollingsworth (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 250 Letter from Ethan D. Dettmer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order 249 Letter from Nicole J. Moss. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 248 Reply Memorandum re 216 MOTION TO REALIGN DEFENDANT ATTORNEY GENERAL EDMUND G. BROWN filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 247 Minute Entry: TELEPHONIC Discovery Hearing held on 11/2/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 11/3/2009). (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 246 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/02/2009, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 245 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 246 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/02/2209, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 11/3/2009) Modified on 11/3/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 244 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 246 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/02/2009, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/23/2009. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 11/3/2009) Modified on 11/3/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 243 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 246 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/02/2009, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 11/3/2009) Modified on 11/3/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 242 Letter from Ethan D. Dettmer. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/2/2009 02:30 PM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 241 CLERKS NOTICE : Telephone conference re discovery scheduled for 11/2/2009 at 2:30 PM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 240 Memorandum in Opposition re 216 MOTION TO REALIGN DEFENDANT ATTORNEY GENERAL EDMUND G. BROWN filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 239 Memorandum in Opposition re 216 MOTION TO REALIGN DEFENDANT ATTORNEY GENERAL EDMUND G. BROWN filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 DECLARATION OF TAMAR PACHTER)(Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 238 Letter from Charles J. Cooper. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 237 ORDER denying 220 Motion to Stay (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 236 Letter from Plaintiffs per Paragraph 1.5 of the Court's Standing Orders. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Letter to The Hon. Vaughn R. Walker)(Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 235 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in support of Joint Opposition to Defendant-Intevenors Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal and/or Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 225 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 234 USCA Case Number 09-17241 9th Circuit for 222 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hak-Shing William Tam, Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 233 REPLY to Response to Motion re 220 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal and/or Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 232 USCA Case Number 09-17241 9th Circuit for 222 Notice of Appeal, filed by Hak-Shing William Tam, Dennis Hollingsworth, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Mark A. Jansson, Martin F. Gutierrez, Gail J. Knight. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 231 Certificate of Record forwarded to USCA re 222 Notice of Appeal (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 230 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 222 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 Docket Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 USCA Appeal Notification Form)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 229 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (Attachments: # 1 docket sheet)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 228 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/14/2009, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 227 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 228 . *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/14/2009, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 10/15/2009) Modified on 10/15/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order 226 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re doc 172 Defendant Intervenors' MOTION for summary judgment. PROCEEDINGS: 1. Defendant-intervenors' motion for summary judgment, Doc #172 - denied. 2. Defendant-intervenors shall file their reply memorandum in support of the motion to stay, Doc #220, not later than October 16, 2009. The court will submit the matter on the papers or hear argument by telephone as necessary. 3. Plaintiffs and the Attorney General shall file their oppositions to defendant-intervenors motion to realign the Attorney General, Doc #216, not later than October 28, 2009. Defendant-intervenors shall file their reply not later than November 4, 2009. The matter will be submitted on the papers. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/14/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 225 Memorandum in Opposition re 220 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal and/or Petition for Writ of Mandamus CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 223 . filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 224 Declaration of Christopher D. Dusseault in Support of 223 Memorandum in Opposition, TO DEFENDANT-INTERVENORS MOTION FOR A STAY PENDING APPEAL AND/OR PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 223 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 223 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 225 . *** Memorandum in Opposition re 220 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal and/or Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 10/13/2009) Modified on 10/14/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 222 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 214 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt Number 34611037633.(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 221 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC 222 NOTICE by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam of Appeal (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 10/9/2009) Modified on 10/9/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/9/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 220 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal and/or Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jesse Panuccio, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 10/8/2009) Modified on 10/9/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order 219 ORDER of USCA as to 168 Notice of Appeal, filed by Campaign for California Families (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order 218 Letter from Charles J. Cooper to The Honorable Chief Judge Walker. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 217 Declaration of Jesse Panuccio in Support of 216 MOTION TO REALIGN DEFENDANT ATTORNEY GENERAL EDMUND G. BROWN filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 216 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 216 MOTION TO REALIGN DEFENDANT ATTORNEY GENERAL EDMUND G. BROWN filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 215 Letter from Christopher Dusseault to the Honorable Chief Judge Walker. (Piepmeier, Sarah) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 214 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 187 Motion for Protective Order (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 213 Reply Memorandum re 172 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and Defendant-Intervenors' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 212 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/25/09, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Bryce, E-mail courtreporter232@aol.com Telephone number (510)828-9404. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/28/2009. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 211 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing re leave to file motion for protective order held on 9/25/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 9/29/2009). (Court Reporter Kelly Bryce.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/29/2009)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 210 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 198 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Jesse Panuccio Pro Hac Vice representing Defendant-Intervenors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 209 ORDER granting 208 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Proponents' reply shall not exceed 25 pages. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 208 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nicole Jo Moss)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 207 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 186 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Joshua Schiller Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 206 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 185 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Richard J. Bettan Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 205 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 171 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Nicole J. Moss Pro Hac Vice representing Intervenor Defendants. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 204 Declaration of Enrique A. Monagas in Support of 202 Memorandum in Opposition filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 202 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 203 Declaration of Christopher D. Dusseault in Support of 202 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Related document(s) 202 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 202 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 201 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Amendment to 200 Joinder Amended Certificate of Service. (Burns, Gordon) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 200 Joinder Defendant Attorney General's Joinder in Plaintiffs and Plaintiff-Intervenors Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Burns, Gordon) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 199 Statement in Response to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment by Mark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 198 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Jesse Panuccio ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611036917.) filed by Campaign for California Families, Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 197 Reply Memorandum re 187 MOTION for Protective Order filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF EXPERT WITNESSES re doc 190 filed by Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/22/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 195 Letter from The Administration Formal Written Request to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing on Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Protective Order. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 194 Statement of Non-Opposition to 187 Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Protective Order filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/21/2009) Modified on 9/22/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 193 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 188 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Rosanne C. Baxter Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 191 Memorandum in Opposition re 187 MOTION for Protective Order filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 190 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE DISCOVERY OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Monagas, Enrique) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 189 USCA Case Number 09-16959 9th Circuit for 168 Notice of Appeal, filed by Campaign for California Families. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 188 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Rosanne C. Baxter ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611036688.) filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 187 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Reply Br. for Aplt., Citizens United v. FEC, # 2 Exhibit B -- Prentice Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C -- Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production, # 4 Exhibit D -- Defendant-Intervenors' Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production, # 5 Exhibit E -- Letter of August 27, 2009, # 6 Exhibit F -- Letter of August 31, 2009, # 7 Exhibit G -- Moss Declaration, # 8 Exhibit H -- Doe v. Reec Opinion, # 9 Exhibit I -- Schubert Declaration, # 10 Exhibit J -- Jannson Declaration, # 11 Exhibit K -- Articles Discussing Negative Effects of Public Disclosure, # 12 Exhibit L -- Tam Declaration, # 13 Exhibit M -- Toupis Declaration, # 14 Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Defendant-Intervenors' motion for leave to file a motion for a protective order, doc #175, set for 9/25/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 186 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Schiller ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611036577.) filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 185 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Richard J. Bettan ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611036579.) filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 184 ORDER re 175 181 182 . Defendant-intervenors shall file motion for protective order not later than 9/15/09. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition not later than 9/18/09. Defendant-intervenors may file a reply not later than 9/22/09. The court will hear the matter on 9/25/09 at 10AM. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 183 ORDER re 172 GRANTING defendant-intervenors' motion for leave to file their motion papers. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 182 Letter from Therese M. Stewart. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 181 Letter from Ethan D. Dettmer re Request for Leave to File Mot. for Protective Order. (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 180 Declaration of Therese M. Stewart in Support of 179 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Therese M. Stewart re City and County of San Francisco's Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Administrative Leave to Exceed Page Limitations filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) 179 ) (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 179 Memorandum in Opposition City and County of San Francisco's Opposition to Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Administrative Leave to Exceed Page Limitations filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 178 ORDER clarifying discovery dates. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 177 Proposed Order re 174 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Administrative Leave to Exceed Page Limitations by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 176 Declaration of Matthew D. McGill in Support of 174 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion for Administrative Leave to Exceed Page Limitations filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Related document(s) 174 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 175 Letter from Charles J. Cooper to Court re Request for Leave to File Mot. for Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Enclosure (RFPs), # 2 Enclosure (Ltr.), # 3 Enclosure (Ltr.))(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 174 Memorandum in Opposition re 172 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 173 Declaration of Nicole J. Moss in Support of 172 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Related document(s) 172 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 172 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 - Defendant-Intervenors' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A -- D.C. Superior Court Opinion, # 3 Exhibit B -- California Laws, # 4 Exhibit C -- AG Brown Brief, # 5 Exhibit D -- AB 205 Legislative History, # 6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting a two-day extension of time in which to file its answer to the City's Complaint in intervention for declaratory, injunctive or other relief, re doc 167 filed by Mark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/4/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order 169 The Administration's ANSWER to Complaint in Intervention for Declaratory, Injunctive or Other Relief byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 192 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 163 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Mathew D. Staver Pro Hac Vice representing Proposed Intervenor. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 171 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Nicole J. Moss Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611036190) filed by Campaign for California Families, Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Lavender Seniors of the East Bay, Our Family Coalition, Parents, Families, and Friends of Lesbians and Gays, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 167 STIPULATION to Extend Time for the Administration Defendants to File and Serve Answer to Complaint in Intervention by Mark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 166 ANSWER to Complaint in intervention byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 165 ANSWER to Complaint byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 168 NOTICE OF APPEAL re 160 Civil Minute Order by Campaign for California Families. Filing fee $ 455.00. Receipt Number 34611035917. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement, # 2 Representation Statement) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order 164 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 8/21/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 162 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 19, 2009, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2009. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order 161 COMPLAINT in Intervention for Declaratory, Injunctive or Other Relief against Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Mark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott (Filing fee $ 350.). Filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Flynn, Ronald) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2009 10:00 AM. Trial set for 1/11/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 160 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/19/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. PROCEEDINGS and RESULTS: The Court heard argument from counsels and ruled as follows: 1. Motion to intervene as party plaintiffs filed by the Our Family coalition, Doc #79 - denied. 2.Motion for intervention as intervenor-defendant filed by Campaign for California Families, Doc # 91 - denied. 3. Motion to intervene filed by City and County of San Francisco, Doc #109 - granted in part to allow San Francisco to present issue of alleged effect on governmental interests. 4.Trial setting and scheduling as follows:a). Designation of witnesses presenting evidence under FRE 702, 703 or 705 and production of written reports pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(2)(B): October 2, 2009; b). Dispositive motions to be served and filed so as to be heard on October 14, 2009 at 10 AM; c). Completion of all discovery, except for evidence intended solely to contradict or rebut evidence on the same subject matter identified by another party under FRCP 26(a)(2)(B): November 30, 2009; d). Completion of discovery on the same subject matter identified by another party under FRCP 26(a)(2)(B): December 31, 2009; see FRCP 26(a)(2)(C)(ii); e). Pretrial conference: December 16, 2009 at 10 AM; f). Trial: January 11, 2010 at 8:30 AM. 5. With respect to any disputes regarding discovery, counsel are directed to comply with Civ LR 37-1(b) and the court's standing order 1.5. 6. In the absence of the assigned judge, counsel are directed to bring any discovery disputes before Magistrate Judge Joseph C Spero. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 163 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Mathew D. Staver, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 346110035676.) filed by Campaign for California Families. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 159 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Supplemental) filed by Dennis Hollingsworth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Stipulations, # 2 Exhibit B -- Responses to Proposed Stipulations)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 158 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by ACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 157 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Supplemental) filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 156 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Case Management Statement of Defendant PatrickO'Connell, Clerk-Recorder of Alameda County and Certificate of Service filed by Patrick O'Connell. (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 155 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Supplemental) filed by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 154 AMENDED 7/2/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CIVIL MINUTE ORDER. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 153 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ATTORNEY GENERAL'S SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service)(Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 152 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Supplemental) filed by Mark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 151 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Campaign for California Families. (McAlister, Mary) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order 150 ASSOCIATION of Counsel Gary G. Kreep by Campaign for California Families. (McAlister, Mary) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order 149 RESPONSE in Support of Motion to Intervene filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order 148 RESPONSE in Support CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO INTERVENE AS PARTY PLAINTIFF filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Chou, Danny) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order 147 Reply Memorandum re 91 MOTION to Intervene filed byCampaign for California Families. (McAlister, Mary) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Yeh Chou (Chou, Danny) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 145 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) re 144 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options and Certificate of Service re document 144 ) (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 144 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options and Certificate of Service (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 143 NOTICE of Change of Address by Austin R. Nimocks (Nimocks, Austin) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 142 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jordan W. Lorence (Lorence, Jordan) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 141 ORDER to submit joint or separate case management statements not later than August 17, 2009 at noon PDT. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 140 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 130 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Rena M Lindevaldsen Pro Hac Vice representing proposed intervenor The Campaign. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 139 Statement of Case Management by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 138 Memorandum in Opposition re 79 MOTION to Intervene filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/10/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/10/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 137 Memorandum in Opposition re 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/10/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/10/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 136 Memorandum in Opposition re 91 MOTION to Intervene filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr, Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A - Declaration of James A. Campbell, # 2 Exhibit Exh. B - VoteYesMarriage.com Amendment Comparison, # 3 Exhibit Exh. C - Bennet v. Brown, No. S164520, # 4 Exhibit Exh. D - 11/18/08 Letter Brief to the California Supreme Court)(Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/10/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/10/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 135 Memorandum in Opposition re 79 MOTION to Intervene, 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities, 91 MOTION to Intervene filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 134 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Lynn Borelli (Borelli, Tara) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 132 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Mark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Stroud, Andrew) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 127 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Case Management Statement of The Attorney General filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order 126 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Dean C. Logan and Patrick O'Connell filed by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 131 Proposed Order - Rena M. Lindecaldsen re 130 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611035060.) by Campaign for California Families. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 130 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611035060.) filed by Campaign for California Families. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 125 Statement re 91 MOTION to Intervene - Statement of No Position by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 124 Statement re 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities - Statement of No Position by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order 123 Statement re 79 MOTION to Intervene Statement of No Position by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 122 Statement of Non-Opposition re 91 MOTION to Intervene filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Related document(s) 91 ) (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 121 Statement of Non-Opposition re 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Related document(s) 109 ) (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 120 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmund G. Brown, Jr (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 119 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 122 . *** MOTION to Intervene OF CAMPAIGN FOR CALIFORNIA FAMILIES filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 7/29/2009) Modified on 7/29/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/30/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 118 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 121 . *** MOTION to Intervene OF THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 7/29/2009) Modified on 7/29/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/30/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 117 Statement of Non-Opposition re 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Defendant Patrick O'Connell's Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Intervene Filed by the City and County of San Francisco filed byPatrick O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Related document(s) 109 ) (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 116 Statement of Non-Opposition re 91 MOTION to Intervene Defendant Patrick O'Connell's Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Intervene Filed by Campaign for California Families filed byPatrick O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Related document(s) 91 ) (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 115 Statement of Non-Opposition re 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Related document(s) 109 ) (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 114 Statement of Non-Opposition re 91 MOTION to Intervene filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Related document(s) 91 ) (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 113 Statement of Non-Opposition re 79 MOTION to Intervene filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order 129 Brief re 128 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed byMark S. Shirlau. (Attachments: # 1 2nd half of brief)(Related document(s) 128 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 24, 2009 Opinion or Order 128 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Mark S. Shirlau. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 112 Proposed Order re 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Intervene by City and County of San Francisco. (Bernstein, Erin) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 111 Declaration of Therese M. Stewart in Support of 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8A, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8B, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10A, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10B, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12A, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 12B, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 14A, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 14B, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 16A, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 16B, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Related document(s) 109 ) (Bernstein, Erin) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 110 Declaration of Erin Bernstein in Support of 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities Declaration of Erin Bernstein regarding Electronic Signatures on Documents Filed in Support of Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Related document(s) 109 ) (Bernstein, Erin) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 109 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Party Plaintiff; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by City and County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Bernstein, Erin) (Filed on 7/23/2009)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Warren Davidson (Davidson, Jon) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Carol Pizer (Pizer, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order 106 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 45 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Jordan W. Lorence Pro Hac Vice representing proposed intervenors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order 105 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 44 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Austin R. Nimocks Pro Hac Vice representing proposed intervenors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Motion Hearing re Docs #79 and 91 set for 8/19/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 104 ORDER re motions to intervene. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Albert Coles (Coles, Matthew) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 102 NOTICE of Appearance by James Dixon Esseks (Esseks, James) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 100 Statement of Non-Opposition re 85 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendant Patrick O'Connell's Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion to Shorten Time and Motion to Intervene Filed by Our Family Coalition, Lavender Seniors of the East Bay, and Parents, Friends, and Families of Lesbians and Gays filed byPatrick O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Related document(s) 85 ) (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order 99 NOTICE by Edmund G. Brown, Jr re 98 Notice of Change In Counsel Certificate of Service (Burns, Gordon) (Filed on 7/13/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 98 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Gordon Bruce Burns (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Burns, Gordon) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilona Margaret Turner (Turner, Ilona) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Minter (Minter, Shannon) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 95 Statement of Non-Opposition to Proposed Intervenors Our Families Coalition, et al.'s Motion to Intervene and Motion to Shorten Time filed byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Francis Stoll (Stoll, Christopher) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 90 Declaration of Charles J. Cooper in Support of 89 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Related document(s) 89 ) (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order 89 Memorandum in Opposition re 85 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Cooper, Charles) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 88 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 85 MOTION to Shorten Time filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Related document(s) 85 ) (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 87 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Lawrence Schlosser (Schlosser, Alan) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 86 Declaration of Elizabeth Gill filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 85 MOTION to Shorten Time filed by ACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 84 Proposed Order re 79 MOTION to Intervene by ACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 83 Declaration of Jody Huckaby filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 82 Declaration in Support of 79 MOTION to Intervene filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 81 Declaration of Judith K. Appel in Support of 79 MOTION to Intervene filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 80 Declaration of Elizabeth Gill in Support of 79 MOTION to Intervene filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention)(Related document(s) 79 ) (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 79 MOTION to Intervene filed by ACLU Foundation of Northern California. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order 78 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/02/09, before Judge Vaughn R. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar McVickar, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_mcvickar@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/5/2009. (McVickar, Sahar) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 101 Letter from Citizen X (anonymous voter) to Chief Judge Vaughn Walker dated 6/22/2009. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2009 10:00 AM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order 77 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/2/2009, Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo, Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry. The Court heard argument from counsel. The parties to submit joint case management statement no later than August 7, 2009.The matter is scheduled for further hearing on August 19, 2009 at 10:00 AM. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/2/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 76 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Intervene, continuing hearing on preliminary injunction in favor of a case management conference on 7/2/2009 at 10AM. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 75 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 63 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Tobias Barrington Wolff Pro Hac Vice representing amicus curiae Equality California. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 74 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 59 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Defendant's counsel may listen to the proceedings at the 7/2/09 hearing. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 73 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 58 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Peter A Patterson Pro Hac Vice representing Proposed Intervenors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 72 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 57 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney David H Thompson Pro Hac Vice representing Proposed Intervenors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 71 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 56 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Charles J Cooper Pro Hac Vice representing Proposed Intervenors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order 70 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 55 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Howard C Nielson Jr. Pro Hac Vice representing Proposed Intervernors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 27, 2009 Opinion or Order 69 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 64 motion for Leave to File (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2009)
June 27, 2009 Opinion or Order 68 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 61 motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2009)
June 27, 2009 Opinion or Order 67 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 50 motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2009)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 93 Proposed Order re 91 MOTION to Intervene by Campaign for California Families. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 92 Declaration of Randy Thomasson in Support of 91 MOTION to Intervene filed byCampaign for California Families. (Related document(s) 91 ) (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 91 MOTION to Intervene filed by Campaign for California Families. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 66 Proposed Order re 64 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Equality California [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Equality California by Equality California. (Brosnahan, James) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 65 Brief re 64 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Equality California Brief of Amicus Curiae Equality California filed byEquality California. (Related document(s) 64 ) (Brosnahan, James) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 64 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae Equality California filed by Equality California. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Brosnahan, James) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 63 MOTION of Tobias Barrington Wolff for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611033644) filed by Equality California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 62 Brief re 61 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed byACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 61 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by ACLU Foundation of Northern California. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order 60 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Elizabeth O. Gill on behalf of ACLU Foundation of Northern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gill, Elizabeth) (Filed on 6/25/2009)
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order 59 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Dean C. Logan. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 6/23/2009)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 58 MOTION of Peter A. Patterson for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611033458) filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 57 MOTION of David H. Thompson for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611033457) filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 56 MOTION of Charles J. Cooper for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611033456) filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order 55 MOTION of Howard C. Nielson, Jr. for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611033459) filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 54 Declaration of Mollie M. Lee in Support of 53 Amicus Curiae Appearance filed byCity and County of San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - J)(Related document(s) 53 ) (Van Aken, Christine) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 53 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Christine Van Aken on behalf of City and County of San Francisco. (Van Aken, Christine) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 52 Reply Memorandum re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byPaul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 51 Proposed Order re 50 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief by City and County of San Francisco. (Van Aken, Christine) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order 50 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by City and County of San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Van Aken, Christine) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 49 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer re 47 , 48 . (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick O'Connell re 47 Statement of Non-Opposition. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order 47 Statement of Non-Opposition re Plantiff's 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Patrick O'Connell. (Related document(s) 7 ) (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2009)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 46 The Administration's ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory, Injunctive, or Other Relief byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick O'Connell re 30 Response in Support, (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order 42 ANSWER to Complaint byPatrick O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 6/16/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 45 MOTION of Jordan W. Lorence for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611033245) filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 44 MOTION of Austin R. Nimocks for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611033246) filed by Martin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, Proposition 8 Official Proponents, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 41 ANSWER to Complaint byDean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edmund G. Brown, Jr (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 6/15/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 39 ANSWER to Complaint of California Attorney General byEdmund G. Brown, Jr. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patrick O'Connell re 37 Statement of Non-Opposition To Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 12, 2009 Opinion or Order 37 Statement of Non-Opposition To 8 Proposed Intervenors' Motion to Intervene filed byPatrick O'Connell. (Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 6/12/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 36 Memorandum in Opposition re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byMartin F. Gutierrez, Dennis Hollingsworth, Mark A. Jansson, Gail J. Knight, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal, Hak-Shing William Tam. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Proposed Order, # 8 Certificate of Service)(Raum, Brian) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 35 Statement of Non-Opposition Defendant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Proposed Intervenors' 8 Motion to Intervene filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition Attorney General's Opposition to Plaintiffs' 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr. (Pachter, Tamar) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 33 Memorandum in Opposition re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 32 Statement of Non-Opposition re 8 MOTION to Intervene filed byMark B. Horton, Arnold Schwarzenegger, Linette Scott. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Mennemeier, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 31 Statement of Non-Opposition to Proposed Intervenors' 8 Motion to Intervene by Paul T. Katami, Kristin M. Perry, Sandra B. Stier, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (Olson, Theodore) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 30 RESPONSE in Support re 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendant Patrick O'Connell's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Certificate of Service filed byPatrick O'Connell. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kolm, Claude) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dean C. Logan (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 28 Statement of No Position to 8 Motion to Intervene by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order 27 Statement of No Position to the 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Dean C. Logan. (Whitehurst, Judy) (Filed on 6/11/2009) Modified on 6/15/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 26 Letter from Bill Plummer to the Honorable Judge Walker regarding Alliance Defense Fund hearing 7/2/2009. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 22 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Brian W Raum Pro Hac Vice representing Proposed Intervenors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 20 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney James A Campbell Pro Hac Vice representing Proposed Intervenors. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2009)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 23 Proposed Order re 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611032701.). (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Brian W. Raum ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611032701.). (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 21 Proposed Order re 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611032700.). (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - James A. Campbell ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611032700.). (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order 19 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 18 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney David Boies Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 17 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc 5 Motion Application for Admission of Attorney Matthew McGill Pro Hac Vice representing the Plaintiffs. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, etc., ON DEAN C. LOGAN (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, etc., ON LINETTE SCOTT (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, etc., ON MARK B. HORTON (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, etc., ON ARNOLD SCHWARZENEGGER (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, etc., ON PATRICK O'CONNELL (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, etc., ON EDMUND G. BROWN (Dettmer, Ethan) (Filed on 5/29/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Dennis Hollingsworth, Gail J. Knight, Martin F. Gutierrez, Hak-Shing William Tam, Mark A. Jansson, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 9 Proposed Intervenors' ANSWER to Complaint byDennis Hollingsworth, Gail J. Knight, Martin F. Gutierrez, Hak-Shing William Tam, Mark A. Jansson, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 28, 2009 Opinion or Order 8 MOTION to Intervene filed by Proposition 8 Official Proponents, Dennis Hollingsworth, Gail J. Knight, Martin F. Gutierrez, Hak-Shing William Tam, Mark A. Jansson, ProtectMarriage.com - Yes on 8, A Project of California Renewal. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Proposed Order, # 16 Certificate of Service)(Chandler, Timothy) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Katami Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Perry Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Stier Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Zarrillo Declaration, # 5 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order 18 MOTION of David Boies for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611032473.) filed by Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami, Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009) (gsa, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 6 [Proposed] Order Granting re 5 Application for Admission of AttorneyPro Hac Vice Submitted by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami & Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (tn, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 5 APPLICATION of Attorney Matthew D. McGill for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice -[Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 34611032460] Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami & Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (tn, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 4 CERTIFICATION of Interested Entities or Persons Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami & Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (tn, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 8/27/2009 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 9/3/2009 at 3:30 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (tn, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Arnold Schwarzenegger, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Mark B. Horton, Linette Scott, Patrick O'Connell & Dean C. Logan. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (tn, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory, Injunctive or other Relief - [Summons Issued] against Arnold Schwarzenegger, Edmund G. Brown, Jr, Mark B. Horton, Linette Scott, Patrick O'Connell & Dean C. Logan, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611032459] Filed by Plaintiffs Sandra B. Stier, Kristin M. Perry, Paul T. Katami & Jeffrey J. Zarrillo. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2009: # 1 Complaint) (tn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin M. Perry
Represented By: Theodore Hideyuki Uno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra B. Stier
Represented By: Theodore Hideyuki Uno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul T. Katami
Represented By: Theodore Hideyuki Uno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey J. Zarrillo
Represented By: Theodore Hideyuki Uno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark B. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linette Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean C. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?