United States Of America v. Approximately $8,800 in American Express Travelers' Checks et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Approximately $8,800 in American Express Travelers' Checks and One Pentax 35mm Camera, Serial Number 1318242
Case Number: 3:2009cv02308
Filed: May 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/7/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/24/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER TEMPORARILY ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE by Hon. William Alsup granting 50 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER RE STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 46 Order Staying Case (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE re 43 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States Of America (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 41 Case Management Statement filed by United States Of America]. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/2/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 39 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States Of America]. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge WilliamAlsup on 12/9/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER TO STAY (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 34 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States Of America]. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint case management statement due by 8/25/2011. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/5/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
January 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER STAYING CASE, Motions terminated: 28 MOTION to Stay (Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Case Pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981(g) and [Propos ed] Order) MOTION to Stay (Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Stay Civil Forfeiture Case Pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981(g) and [Proposed] Order) filed by United States Of America. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 11:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 5, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2011)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STAY FORFEITURE PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 27, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER CONTINUING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 11, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING STAY. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/22/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 3, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Approximately $8,800 in American Express Travelers' Checks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: David B. Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $8,800 in American Express Travelers' Checks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Pentax 35mm Camera, Serial Number 1318242
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?