R.C. Fischer & Co. v. Cartwright et al
Plaintiff: R.C. Fischer & Co.
Defendant: Charles Cartwright and The Marine Vessel INKATU (bearing hull identification number TYA37488K586), her engines, apparel, electronics, tackle, appurtenances, etc., in rem
Case Number: 3:2009cv02316
Filed: May 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Alter Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to Amend/Correct ; ; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 19, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER REGARDING ADDITIONAL POST-TRIAL BRIEFING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 1, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REQUIRING FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 7/1/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING LIMITED EXTENSION of Time to File Pretrial Materials. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/23/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL from 4/27/2011 to 7/21/2011, re doc 45 . A pretrial conference is scheduled for 7/12/2011 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/4/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES: Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2011 02:00 PM. Bench Trial set for 4/25/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/18/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND SETTING PRETRIAL DATES re 42 Stipulation filed by R.C. Fischer & Co.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 11, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE - Last day to hear dispositive motions 10/5/2010 09:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2010 02:00 PM. Bench Trial set for 1/5/2011 08:30 AM. 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/28/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOLLOWING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 29, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 34 Letter filed by Quark Speed Partners, R.C. Fischer & Co.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 17, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION & ORDER Signed by Mag. Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/25/2010 Continuing Case Management Conference Date from 3/2/2010 to 3/23/2010 at 10:00 a.m. re 32 Stipulation. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE re 30 Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 2/8/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER approving telephonic appearance at mediation by party respresentatives re 26 Stipulation filed by Charles Cartwright. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/25/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Stipulation filed by Quark Speed Partners, R.C. Fischer & Co.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 12, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re 16 Letter filed by R.C. Fischer & Co.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 31, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.C. Fischer & Co. v. Cartwright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.C. Fischer & Co.
Represented By: Pandit Fateh Sahota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Cartwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Marine Vessel INKATU (bearing hull identification number TYA37488K586), her engines, apparel, electronics, tackle, appurtenances, etc., in rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?