Bolden v. Ayers

Petitioner: Clifford Stanley Bolden
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Case Number: 3:2009cv02365
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING STAY by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 46 Motion to Dismiss (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER REGARDING EXHAUSTION AND PROCEDURAL MATTERS re 44 Stipulation filed by Michael Martel. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/31/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S RENEWED MOTION FOR EQUITABLE TOLLING by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 22 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR EQUITABLE TOLLING re 20 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Clifford Stanley Bolden, Michael Martel. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/17/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolden v. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford Stanley Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert L. Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?