Allen v. United Financial Mortgage Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Euel Allen
Defendant: United Financial Mortgage Corp., Alliance Bancorp, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., California Reconveyance Company, GMAC Mortgage and JP Morgan Chase Bank
Case Number: 3:2009cv02507
Filed: June 5, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/2/2011. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING 54 Stipulation filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc., JP Morgan Chase Bank, California Reconveyance Company (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER Court Trial set for 3/14/11 is continued to 4/25/2011 09:30 AM before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/26/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 COURT TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/18/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER: the date for completion of mediation is April 13, 2010. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 2/16/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the mediation deadline by sixty (60) days.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/14/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 4 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re Incomplete Filing. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
June 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge James Larson on 6/18/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. United Financial Mortgage Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Euel Allen
Represented By: Patricia Ann Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Reconveyance Company
Represented By: John M. Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?