Georgy v. AlliedBarton Security Services LP
Plaintiff: Philip Georgy
Defendant: AlliedBarton Security Services LP
Case Number: 3:2009cv02531
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/3/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER referring case to Mediation. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting request re 23 .(tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER continuing cmc to 2/4/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgy v. AlliedBarton Security Services LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Georgy
Represented By: Michael A. Farbstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedBarton Security Services LP
Represented By: Marty Norenburg Martenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?