Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund et al v. Simi Management Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, James H. Beno, Bill Brunelli, Stephen J. Mack, Chris Christophersen, Don Crosatto, Mark Hollibush, George Hall, Jr., Charles J. Di Bari, Ron Nelson and James V. Canterbury
Defendant: Simi Management Corp. and Steven A. Simi
Case Number: 3:2009cv02550
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1451 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/3/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING re 58 Notice Of Settlement and Joint Request to Vacate Case Management Conference filed by Charles J. Di Bari, Stephen J. Mack, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, James H. Beno, Ron Nelson, James V. Canterbury, George Hall, Jr., Mark Hollibush, Bill Brunelli, Don Crosatto. Case Mgmt Conference set for 2/18/11 at 1:30 PM has been vacated. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/31/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING THAT COURT CONTINUE DEADLINE FOR COMPLETING MEDIATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 2/18/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated joint cmc statement dueby 2/11/11.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 Joint Letter filed by Charles J. Di Bari, Stephen J. Mack, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, James H. Beno, Ron Nelson, James V. Canterbury, George Hall, Jr., Mark Hollibush, Bill Brunelli, Don Crosatto to appear telephonically at the further case management conference on 11/5/10 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/27/10. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING re 42 Joint Letter filed by Charles J. Di Bari, Stephen J. Mack, Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund, Chris Christophersen, James H. Beno, Ron Nelson, James V. Canterbury, George Hall, Jr., Mark Hollibush, Bill Brunelli, Don Crosatto for Michele Scula and Douglas Marshall to appear by phone for the CMC on 9/17/10. Signed by Judge 09/14/10 on Joseph C. Spero. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2009 AT 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/21/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation re Reassignment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 16, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 14 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/17/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING 11 Stipulation to Continue Initial CMC. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund et al v. Simi Management Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Automotive Industries Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Beno
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Brunelli
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen J. Mack
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Christophersen
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Crosatto
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hollibush
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Hall, Jr.
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles J. Di Bari
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Nelson
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James V. Canterbury
Represented By: Philip M. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simi Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Simi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?