Conwright v. City Of Oakland et al
Plaintiff: Joanne Conwright
Defendant: City Of Oakland, Cherry Hall Tongue, Ray Derania, Antoinette Renwick and Jeffrey Robinson
Case Number: 3:2009cv02572
Filed: August 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson denying 212 Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER re: reply on 212 Plaintiff's motion for new trial. Plaintiff has failed to file a reply, and the Court will consider the motion based on the papers that have been timely filed. Motion hearing remains on calendar unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/14/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
April 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 204 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** STIPULATION AND ORDER to Withdraw Document and Permit Filing of New Declaration. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/11/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/11/2012 (tmi, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/21/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER denying as moot Defendant's oral motion for judgment as a matter of law. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/19/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER re 175 Use of Technical Equipment at Trial. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/01/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER re: trial rules and procedures. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/01/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER re Use of Technological Equipment at Trial. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/29/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 120 - 127 129 - 132 motions in limine, vacating 147 ORDER granting motions in limine as unopposed. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: late oppositions to motions in limine. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/27/12 at 10:00 AM. Show Cause Responses, if any, due by 2/24/12 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/23/12. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 120 121 122 123 124 125 126 127 Defendant's Motions in Limine Nos. 1-8 and granting 132 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 2. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 88 Defendant City of Oakland's Motion for Summary Judgment. 114 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue is denied as moot. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER STRIKING DOCKET NOS. re 80 Exhibits filed by City Of Oakland, re 79 Letter filed by City Of Oakland & re 81 Exhibits filed by City Of Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/18/2011. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Excusing Lead Trial Counsel from Appearing in person as directed by the Court's June 6, 2011 Order re 74 Letter filed by City Of Oakland, Cherry Hall Tongue. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/10/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 59 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Derania and Renwick. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 58 Defendant Tongue's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff to meet and confer with Defendants and file amended complaint, if any, by 06/21/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 40 Defendant City of Oakland's Motion to Strike. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Scheduling ORDER and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Opposition to 40 Defendant's motion to strike due by 02/18/11; reply due by 02/28/11. Motion hearing and case management conference continued to 03/14/11 at 10:00 AM. Show cause hearing set for 03/14/11 at 10:00 AM. Show cause response and joint case management conference statement due by 03/07/11. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 01/07/11. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER Allowing Plaintiff to File a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/26/10. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 1/24/2011 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/23/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 19 Defendant City of Oakland's Motion to Dismiss. Amended complaint to be filed on or before 10/08/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Scheduling ORDER and ORDER vacating 24 25 Orders to Show Cause. Reply re 19 MOTION to Dismiss due by 08/23/10. Motion hearing set for 09/13/10 at 10:00 AM. Case management conference continued from 08/23/10 to 10/04/10 at 1:30 PM. Joint case management conference statement due 09/27/10. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/09/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why case should not be dismissed and sanctions should not be imposed. Show Cause Responses due by 08/06/10. The 08/16/10 motion hearing is VACATED. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/27/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting extension of time re 19 Defendants' motion to dismiss and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Opposition and show cause response due 07/26/10. Reply due 08/02/10. Motion Hearing and Show Cause Hearing set for 08/16/10 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/30/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2010)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 6/21/2010 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/20/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2009 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/26/09. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conwright v. City Of Oakland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Conwright
Represented By: Marylon M. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Oakland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherry Hall Tongue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Derania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Renwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?