Sandisk Corporation v. LSI Corporation
Plaintiff: Sandisk Corporation
Defendant: LSI Corporation
Counter-claimant: LSI Corporation and Agere Systems Inc.
Counter-defendant: Sandisk Corporation
Case Number: 3:2009cv02737
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER REGARDING EXPERT COMPENSATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 24, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER REGARDING COURT-APPOINTED EXPERT. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 17, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 REQUEST TO POTENTIAL RULE 706 EXPERTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 4, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER RESCHEDULING RULE 706 CONFERENCE TO MARCH 3. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REGARDING EXPERT CANDIDATES. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 22, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR EXTENSION REGARDING RULE 706 EXPERTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 3, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL TO MARCH 3, 2010. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 26, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010)
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING RULE 706 EXPERT. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION WITH MODIFICATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 7, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REGARDING RULE 706 EXPERT. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 1, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER REQUESTING AMENDMENT TO DISCOVERY DISPUTE LETTER (DKT. 58). Signed by Judge Alsup on November 20, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 58 Letter filed by Sandisk Corporation]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/19/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER RE SCHEDULE FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 6, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct]. Plaintiff SanDisk is required to E-FILE the amended document. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2009)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandisk Corporation v. LSI Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandisk Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Corporation
Represented By: Melinda Mae Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: LSI Corporation
Represented By: Melinda Mae Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Agere Systems Inc.
Represented By: Melinda Mae Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Sandisk Corporation
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?