Draper et al v. American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr., John Valenton, Michele Draper, Flora Yu, Jonathan D. Singleton and Quinn Ranson
Defendant: Vicky Kancherlapalli, Jan Haussenbauer, Sam Kancherlapalli and American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2009cv02753
Filed: June 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #56 Motion (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 16, 2011 Filing 58 Proposed Order re #56 APPLICATION To Be Relieved As Counsel for Defendants filed by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc., Jan Haussenbauer, Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 2/16/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2011 Filing 57 DECLARATION of Todd Scherwin in Support of #56 APPLICATION To Be Relieved As Counsel for Defendants filed by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc., Jan Haussenbauer, Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 2/16/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2011 Filing 56 APPLICATION To Be Relieved As Counsel for Defendants filed by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc., Jan Haussenbauer, Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 2/16/2011) Modified on 2/23/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Vaughn R Walker granting doc #50 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Pursuant to the Stipulation for Entry of Judgment executed by the Parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiffs Michele Draper, Meriwether Lewis Garing Jr, John Valenton, Robert Erskine, Flora Yu, Jonathan D singleton and Quinn Ranson recover from defendants Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli and Janet Hausenbauer, jointly and severally, the sum of $145,208.31 plus Plaintiffs' reasonably fees and costs incurred to obtain entry of and to enforce this Judgment. Upon entry of this Judgment, Plaintiffs shall be entitled to interest at the rate of 10% per annum. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #50 , #51 , #52 , #53 by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2011) Modified on 2/15/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2011 Filing 53 [Proposed] Judgment Against Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli and Jan Hausenbauer by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2011) Modified on 2/15/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2011 Filing 52 STIPULATION for Entry of Judgment by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 14, 2011 Filing 51 DECLARATION of Nicholas A. Carlin In Support of #50 Request for Entry of Judgment Against Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli and Janet Hausenbauer filed by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2011) Modified on 2/15/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2011 Filing 50 REQUEST for Entry of Judgment Against Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli and Janet Hausenbauer by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2011) Modified on 2/15/2011 (far, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2011 Filing 49 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #50 . *** NOTICE by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu Request for Entry of Default Against Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli and Janet Hausenbauer (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/14/2011) Modified on 2/15/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER. Having advised the court that the parties have agreed to a settlement; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this cause of action be dismissed with prejudice, provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to this court, within ninety days, with proof of service of a copy thereof, that the agreed consideration for said settlement has not been delivered over, the foregoing order shall stand vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 47 NOTICE by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu Notice of Settlement (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 6, 2010 Filing 46 Letter from Shadie L. Berenji, Attorney for Defendant, American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiffs' request for leave to file a motion to compel. (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
May 5, 2010 Filing 45 Letter from Shadie L. Berenji, Attorney for Defendant, American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 44 Letter from Nicholas A. Carlin, Esq.. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 43 Proposed Order re #42 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support; Counsel Declaration (with Exhibits) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support; Counsel Declaration (with Exhibits) by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu. (Given, David) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 42 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support; Counsel Declaration (with Exhibits) filed by Michele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Given, David) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY CUTOFF AND RELATED DATES, re doc #40 filed by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc. The discovery cutoff date is continued to 8/16/2010. The hearing date for dispositive motion is continued to 10/7/2010 at 10:00 AM. The pretrial conference is continued to 12/2/2010 at 3:30 PM and all related pretrial deadlines are continued accordingly. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/13/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 13, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery Cutoff: 8/16/2010. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2010 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 9, 2010 Filing 40 STIPULATION to Continue Discovery Cut Off and Releated Dates by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/23/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 37 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) byVicky Kancherlapalli. (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 36 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) bySam Kancherlapalli. (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) byJan Haussenbauer. (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 34 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint) byAmerican Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 38 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/17/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker. Fact discovery cutoff: 6/30/2010. Dispositive Motions Hearing: 8/19/2010 at 10:00 AM. + Expert discovery schedule. Pretrial Conference/Trial Setting: 9/30/2010 at 3:30 PM. (Court Reporter not reported.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2009)
December 17, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2010 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference/Trial Setting set for 9/30/2010 03:30 PM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/14/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 32 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc., Jan Haussenbauer, Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli. (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 2, 2009 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Injuncitve Relief for Violations of the California Labor Code, Fair Labor Standards Act and Related Causes of Action; Demand for Jury Trial against American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc., Jan Haussenbauer, Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli. Filed byJonathan D. Singleton, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Robert Erskine, Flora Yu, Michele Draper, Quinn Ranson, John Valenton. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part and denying in part doc #16 Motion to Dismiss. Pla's ninth, tenth and seventeenth claims are dismissed but may be amended to remedy the deficiencies described in this order. Any amendment must be filed not later than 12/3/2009. The motion to dismiss the sixteenth claim is DENIED. Granting in part and denying in part doc #17 Motion to Strike. (vrwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009).
November 13, 2009 Filing 29 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/12/2009 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker (Date Filed: 11/13/2009). (Court Reporter Jim Yeomans.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 28 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Strike First Amended Complaint filed byAmerican Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 Filing 27 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed byAmerican Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 26 NOTICE by Jan Haussenbauer (Answer to Amended Complaint) (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 25 Answer to Amended Complaint byVicky Kancherlapalli. (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 24 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySam Kancherlapalli. (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 22, 2009 Filing 23 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to American Diagnostic Medicine's Motion to Strike Poritons of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byMichele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant American Diagnostic Medicine's Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byMichele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 22, 2009 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant American Diagnostic Medicine's Motion to Dismiss filed byMichele Draper, Robert Erskine, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Quinn Ranson, Jonathan D. Singleton, John Valenton, Flora Yu. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
September 30, 2009 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting /Case Management Statement. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 29, 2009 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing : Motion Hearing rescheduled for 11/12/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
September 16, 2009 Filing 18 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss/Strike filed byAmerican Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 9/16/2009)
September 14, 2009 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodgment re Mtn to Strike, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Notice of lodgment re Mtn to Dismiss)(Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 14, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 27, 2009 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Jan Haussenbauer, Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 26, 2009 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE CALIFORNIA LABOR CODE, FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT AND RELATED CAUSES OF ACTION against American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc., Sam Kancherlapalli, Vicky Kancherlapalli, Jan Haussenbauer. Filed byJonathan D. Singleton, Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr, Robert Erskine, Flora Yu, Michele Draper, Quinn Ranson, John Valenton. (McKinley-Ball, Meagan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
July 21, 2009 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE on reassignment of case. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2009 03:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2009. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 16, 2009 Filing 12 NOTICE by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc. re #7 MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (Berenji, Shadie) (Filed on 7/16/2009)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Vaughn R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/7/09. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)
July 6, 2009 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **** ERRONEOUS DOCKET ENTRY - Please ignore **** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2009.. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 7/2/2009. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009) Modified on 7/7/2009 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
June 29, 2009 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc. (Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2009 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodgment, #2 Proposed Order)(Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2009 10:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lodgment, #2 Proposed Order)(Scherwin, Todd) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 29, 2009 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Michele Draper , et al. (Carlin, Nicholas) (Filed on 6/29/2009)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2009. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2009 01:30 PM.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/22/09. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PENDENCY by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 2 NOTICE by American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc. re 1 Notice of Removal (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL /no process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC 09-488198. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611033473). Filed byAmerican Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)
June 22, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper et al v. American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Kancherlapalli
Represented By: Todd Brian Scherwin
Represented By: Shadie Latae Berenji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Haussenbauer
Represented By: Todd Brian Scherwin
Represented By: Shadie Latae Berenji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Kancherlapalli
Represented By: Todd Brian Scherwin
Represented By: Shadie Latae Berenji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Diagnostic Medicine, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Murphy
Represented By: Todd Brian Scherwin
Represented By: Shadie Latae Berenji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Erskine
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Meagan Marina Given
Represented By: David M. Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meriwether Lewis Garing, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Meagan Marina Given
Represented By: David M. Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Valenton
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Meagan Marina Given
Represented By: David M. Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Draper
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Meagan Marina Given
Represented By: David M. Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flora Yu
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Meagan Marina Given
Represented By: David M. Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan D. Singleton
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Meagan Marina Given
Represented By: David M. Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quinn Ranson
Represented By: Nicholas A. Carlin
Represented By: Meagan Marina Given
Represented By: David M. Given
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?